Paula S. Gordy LISW, LLC v. Change Healthcare Inc.
Plaintiff: Paula S. Gordy LISW, LLC
Defendant: Change Healthcare Inc.
Case Number: 3:2024cv00386
Filed: April 4, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION #13 TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING RULING ON TRANSFER AND CENTRALIZATION BY JPML. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 5/29/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
May 29, 2024 TN State Bar status verified as active for E. Todd Presnell, Kimberly Michelle Ingram-Hogan admitted to this court. (am)
May 28, 2024 Filing 14 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Change Healthcare Inc.. (Ingram-Hogan, Kimberly)
May 28, 2024 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling On Transfer and Centralization by JPML by Change Healthcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Ingram-Hogan, Kimberly)
May 28, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Michelle Ingram-Hogan on behalf of Change Healthcare Inc. (Ingram-Hogan, Kimberly)
May 28, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by E. Todd Presnell on behalf of Change Healthcare Inc. (Presnell, E.)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Gary M. Klinger to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 04/25/2024. (lh)
April 12, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Gary M. Klinger to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4056238) by Paula S. Gordy LISW, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Attachment List of Admissions)(Klinger, Gary)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 4/5/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
April 5, 2024 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Paula S. Gordy LISW, LLC. Change Healthcare Inc. waiver sent on 4/4/2024. (Stranch, James)
April 4, 2024 Filing 6 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Paula S. Gordy LISW, LLC. (Stranch, James)
April 4, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 7/16/2024 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (ad)
April 4, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad)
April 4, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ad)
April 4, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ad)
April 4, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Change Healthcare Inc. (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4048809), filed by Paula S. Gordy LISW, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(ad)
April 4, 2024 TN State Bar status verified as active for James Gerard Stranch, IV, Michael C Iadevaia, Emily E. Schiller, Robert Bruce Grayson K Wells admitted to this court. (ad)
April 4, 2024 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jonathan M. Streisfeld, Gary M. Klinger, Patrick Montoya, Jeffrey M. Ostrow, Kenneth Jay Grunfeld: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 4/25/2024. (ad)
April 4, 2024 FL State Bar status verified as active for Jonathan M. Streisfeld. FL verified for Jeffrey M. Ostrow. PA verified for Kenneth Jay Grunfeld. FL verified for Patrick Montoya not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ad) Modified on 4/4/2024 (ad).
April 4, 2024 IL State Bar status verified as active for Gary M. Klinger not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paula S. Gordy LISW, LLC v. Change Healthcare Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula S. Gordy LISW, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth Jay Grunfeld
Represented By: Michael C Iadevaia
Represented By: Patrick Montoya
Represented By: Robert Bruce Grayson K Wells
Represented By: Emily E. Schiller
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Ostrow
Represented By: Jonathan M. Streisfeld
Represented By: Jeff Ostrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Change Healthcare Inc.
Represented By: E. Todd Presnell
Represented By: Kimberly Michelle Ingram-Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?