Harris v. Vantell et al
Plaintiff: Ramsey William Harris
Defendant: Vincent Vantell and John Doe #1
Case Number: 3:2024cv00457
Filed: April 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION re Final Judgment on Administrative Grievance Process by Ramsey William Harris. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Inmate Grievance Form)(ad)
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER OF THE COURT: Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider #8 is DENIED without prejudice. The Court's screening of the Complaint and Amended Complaint, the following claims shall proceed: an Eighth Amendment claim against the John Doe Defendant in his individual capacity under Section 1983. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), this action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 5/24/2024. (xc: Order and 1 service packet forwarded to Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Doe #1, filed by Ramsey William Harris.(am)
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Reconsideration re #6 Memorandum Opinion and Order by Ramsey William Harris. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Motion in Support of Appointment of Counsel, #2 Attachment - Proposed Order)(am)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Doe #1, filed by Ramsey William Harris.(am)
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: From a review of Plaintiff's Application, it appears that Plaintiff lacks sufficient financial resources from which to pay the full filing fee in advance. Therefore, his Application (Doc. No. #2 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff is hereby assessed the full civil filing fee of $350. The custodian of Plaintiff's inmate trust fund account at the institution where he now resides is DIRECTED to submit to the Clerk of Court, as an initial payment. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED send a copy of this Order to the administrator of inmate trust fund accounts at the WTSP to ensure that the custodian of Plaintiff's inmate trust account complies with that portion of 28 U.S.C. 1915 pertaining to the payment of the filing fee. The Court finds that the interests of justice do not require the appointment of counsel at this time. Plaintiff's Motion for the Appointment of Counsel (Doc. No. #3 ) therefore is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff may renew this motion at a later time if the circumstances warrant. Having screened the complaint pursuant to the PRLA, the Court finds that the complaint fails to state a Section 1983 claim upon which relief can be granted against Deputy Warden Vantell in his official capacity, which is a claim against CoreCivic. That claim is DISMISSED. With regard to Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment driving-based claim against John Doe in his individual capacity, Plaintiff may amend his complaint to clarify whether Doe acted negligently or with a deliberate indifference to Plaintiff's health or safety. Further, the Court will permit Plaintiff to amend his complaint to add the entity that transported Plaintiff on March 14, 2024, as a defendant to this action, if the facts so warrant. Any such amended complaint MUST be filed within 30 days of entry of this Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 4/22/2024. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. Copy of order sent to the administrator of inmate trust fund accounts at the WTSP. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad)
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ad)
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included.) (ad)
April 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Ramsey William Harris. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(ad)
April 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Ramsey William Harris. (ad)
April 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe #1, Vincent Vantell, filed by Ramsey William Harris. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Summons)(ad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Vantell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramsey William Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Vantell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?