Lee v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Mitchell Lee
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 3:2024cv00520
Filed: April 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Judgment on the Record by Mitchell Lee. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support)(Williams, Melanie)
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: In accordance with Rule 4 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions the Commissioner has responded by filing its answer. Therefore, the filing of a motion for judgment based on the administrative record is appropriate and necessary for the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 6/10/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
June 10, 2024 Pursuant to #7 Administrative Record filed, District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr has been assigned to case in accordance with #4 Notice Regarding Consent of the Parties. (hb)
June 7, 2024 Filing 7 SSA Administrative Record filed per #1 Social Security Complaint.. (Sorkin, Adam)
June 4, 2024 MD State Bar status verified as active for Adam R. Sorkin admitted to this court. Local counsel waived. (kc)
May 28, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam R. Sorkin on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Sorkin, Adam)
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 5/14/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
April 26, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT OF THE PARTIES TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES ARISING UNDER 42 U.S.C. 405(g) (am)
April 26, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (am)
April 26, 2024 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Mitchell Lee. (am)
April 26, 2024 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Mitchell Lee. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am)
April 26, 2024 TN State Bar status verified as active for Melanie N. Williams admitted to this court. (am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Lee
Represented By: Melanie N. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Adam R. Sorkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?