VIP Physicians Consulting LLC v. Change Healthcare Inc. et al
Plaintiff: VIP Physicians Consulting LLC
Defendant: Change Healthcare Inc., Optum, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Inc.
Case Number: 3:2024cv00556
Filed: May 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 , #13 , #14 , and #15 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Jason L. Lichtman, Melissa A. Gardner, Michael K. Sheen, and Michael W. Sobol to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 05/28/2024. (lh) Modified on 5/31/2024 (am).
May 21, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for attorney Michael W. Sobol to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4083607) by VIP Physicians Consulting LLC. (Chalos, Mark)
May 21, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for attorney Michael K. Sheen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4083605) by VIP Physicians Consulting LLC. (Chalos, Mark)
May 21, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for attorney Melissa A. Gardner to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4083601) by VIP Physicians Consulting LLC. (Chalos, Mark)
May 21, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Jason L. Lichtman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4083597) by VIP Physicians Consulting LLC. (Chalos, Mark)
May 17, 2024 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by VIP Physicians Consulting LLC. UnitedHealth Group Inc. waiver sent on 5/3/2024. (Chalos, Mark)
May 17, 2024 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by VIP Physicians Consulting LLC. Optum, Inc. waiver sent on 5/3/2024. (Chalos, Mark)
May 17, 2024 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by VIP Physicians Consulting LLC. Change Healthcare Inc. waiver sent on 5/3/2024. (Chalos, Mark)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 5/7/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
May 6, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 7/26/2024 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (am)
May 6, 2024 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Change Healthcare Inc., Optum, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (am)
May 6, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (am)
May 6, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
May 6, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
May 6, 2024 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jason Lichtman, Michael W. Sobol, Melissa Gardner, Michael Sheen: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 5/28/2024. (am)
May 6, 2024 NY State Bar status verified as active for Jason Lichtman not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (am)
May 6, 2024 CA State Bar status verified as active for Michael W. Sobol, Melissa Gardner, Michael Sheen not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (am)
May 6, 2024 TN State Bar status verified as active for Mark P. Chalos, Kenneth S. Byrd admitted to this court. (am)
May 3, 2024 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by VIP Physicians Consulting LLC. (am)
May 3, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Change Healthcare Inc., Optum, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc. (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4071662), filed by VIP Physicians Consulting LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VIP Physicians Consulting LLC v. Change Healthcare Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIP Physicians Consulting LLC
Represented By: Jason Lichtman
Represented By: Kenneth S. Byrd
Represented By: Mark P. Chalos
Represented By: Melissa Gardner
Represented By: Michael Sheen
Represented By: Michael W. Sobol
Represented By: Jason L. Lichtman
Represented By: Michael K. Sheen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Change Healthcare Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?