Chaffin v. Schneider et al
Plaintiff: Kristofer T. Chaffin
Defendant: Tacoma Chiropractic Group, LLC and Daniel A. Schneider
Case Number: 3:2024cv00625
Filed: May 17, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Other Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: On July 2, 2024, Defendants filed an unopposed motion to continue the initial case management conference set on July 16, 2024. (Doc. No. #7 ). The motion #19 is GRANTED. The initial case management conference is CONTINUED to July 29, 2024, at 9:30 a.m. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 07/03/24. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad)
July 3, 2024 Reset Hearing: Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 7/29/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (ad)
July 2, 2024 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by Daniel A. Schneider, Tacoma Chiropractic Group, LLC. (Adams, Walter)
June 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #11 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Charles S. Lew to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 06/17/2024. (lh)
June 17, 2024 TN State Bar status verified as active for Charles Nathan Yarbrough admitted to this court. (ad)
June 14, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Nathan Yarbrough on behalf of All Defendants (Yarbrough, Charles)
June 13, 2024 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING to Main Document re: #11 MOTION for attorney Charles S. Lew to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4093617). (Harwell, Aubrey) Modified on 6/14/2024 (ad).
June 12, 2024 TN State Bar status verified as active for Walter Justin Adams admitted to this court. (ad)
June 11, 2024 Filing 15 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tacoma Chiropractic Group, LLC. (Adams, Walter)
June 11, 2024 Filing 14 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Daniel A. Schneider. (Adams, Walter)
June 11, 2024 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Daniel A. Schneider, Tacoma Chiropractic Group, LLC.(Adams, Walter)
June 11, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter Justin Adams on behalf of Daniel A. Schneider, Tacoma Chiropractic Group, LLC (Adams, Walter)
June 6, 2024 CA State Bar status verified as active for Charles S. Lew not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ad)
June 6, 2024 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#11 : The Certificate of Good Standing must be from a United States District Court or a United States appellate court. The new certificate shall be filed within 10 days. (ad)
June 5, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Charles S. Lew to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4093617) by Kristofer T. Chaffin. (Attachments: #1 Attachment CA Certificate of Good Standing for Charles S. Lew)(Harwell, Aubrey)
May 22, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by Kristofer T. Chaffin. Tacoma Chiropractic Group, LLC served on 5/21/2024. (Harwell, Aubrey)
May 22, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Kristofer T. Chaffin. Daniel A. Schneider served on 5/21/2024. (Harwell, Aubrey)
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 05/20/24. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad)
May 17, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 7/16/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (am)
May 17, 2024 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Daniel A. Schneider, Tacoma Chiropractic Group, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (am)
May 17, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (am)
May 17, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
May 17, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
May 17, 2024 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kristofer T. Chaffin. (am)
May 17, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daniel A. Schneider, Tacoma Chiropractic Group, LLC (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4081541), filed by Kristofer T. Chaffin. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am)
May 17, 2024 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Charles S. Lew: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 6/7/2024. (am)
May 17, 2024 CA State Bar status verified as active for Charles S. Lew not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (am)
May 17, 2024 TN State Bar status verified as active for Aubrey B. Harwell, III, Nathan C. Sanders, Olivia Rose Arboneaux, Elizabeth Campbell Tirrill admitted to this court. (am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chaffin v. Schneider et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tacoma Chiropractic Group, LLC
Represented By: Walter Justin Adams
Represented By: Charles Nathan Yarbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel A. Schneider
Represented By: Walter Justin Adams
Represented By: Charles Nathan Yarbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristofer T. Chaffin
Represented By: Olivia Rose Arboneaux
Represented By: Nathan C. Sanders
Represented By: Elizabeth Campbell Tirrill
Represented By: Charles S. Lew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?