Phillip M. Adams & Associates, L.L.C. v. Lenovo International et al
Case Number: 1:2005cv00064
Filed: May 12, 2005
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Northern Office
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Presiding Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2027 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 2021 Motion to Review Taxation of Costs ; granting in part and denying in part 2022 Motion to Confirm Costs Taxed by Clerk of Court and Allow Additional Applied for Copying Costs. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 11/7/13. (ss)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1973 MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order on Prejudgment Interest and denying 1965 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of Denial of Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, Alternatively, Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 01/04/2012. (tls)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1955 MEMORANDUM DECISION and Ordergranting 1935 Winbond Electronics Corporation's Motion to Dismiss Asustek Computer Inc. and Asus Computer International's Crossclaims. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 09/29/2011. (tls)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1954 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 1822 Plaintiff's Motion for for Preudgment Interest. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 09/26/2011. (tls)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1938 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER UNSEALING IN REDACTED FORM THE SANCTIONS ORDER RE: ASUSTeK, entry 1770. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 6/22/2011. (ce)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1794 AMENDED MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 1774 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Patent Invalidity Based on Failure to Satisfy Written Description. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 9/29/2010. (las) Modified on 9/30/2010 added Amended text(las).
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1789 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 1752 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law ; denying 1763 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law ; denying 1765 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law ; denying 1767 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law ; denying 1768 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law ; denying 1776 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 9/29/2010. (las)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1756 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1741 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 9/24/2010. (las)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1740 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 960 Motion to Strike the Report of Defendants' Patent Law Expert Nicholas Godici, and to Bar his Testimony. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 9/21/2010. (las)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1736 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 1389 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 9/20/2010. (las)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1732 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER on Winbond's Claim of Privilege. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 9/16/2010. (las)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1723 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER It is Ordered that Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions and other relief against MSI 836 is Granted in part and Sanctions are imposed on MSI in the form of a jury instruction. It is further Ordered that MSI's Objection to Plaintiff's Designation of Testimony of Nora Lee and Jeans Huang 1712 is Denied as Moot. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 9/16/2010. (las)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1717 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1487 Sealed Motion in Limine No. 17. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 9/15/2010. (las)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1710 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 1209 Motion to Strike Portions of Dr. Clifford H. Kraft's Expert Reports ; denying 1396 Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Clifford H. Kraft. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 9/14/2010. (las)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1678 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying in part 1479 Motion in Limine No. 22. By the present ruling, the Court is not ruling on any of the pending objections to the Magistrate Judge's two Orders on Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions against ASUS. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 9/9/2010. (las)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1672 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 1475 Motion in Limine No. 19 to Exclude Argument or Evidence that Plaintiff is Entitled to Damages from MSI's sales that predate June 26, 2007; denying 1481 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 9/8/2010. (las)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1644 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 1630 Motion Clarification. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 9/1/2010. (las)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1624 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 1073 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Misappropriation of Trade Secrets Claim (Count II). Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 8/25/2010. (las)
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1615 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting (subject to provision) 1434 Motion for Dr. Adams to be able to Participate at Trial and to View and Testify Regarding All Proposed Trial Exhibits. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 8/30/2010. (las)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1600 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 1059 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; finding as moot 1065 Motion for Joinder; finding as moot 1079 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 8/24/2010. (las)
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1592 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 1019 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ; denying as moot 1062 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 08/23/2010. (asp)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1586 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 1364 Motion for Sanctions ; denying 1394 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 08/17/2010. (asp)
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1584 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 1464 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 08/17/2010. (asp)
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1575 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 1374 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief Disclosing Newly Discovered Evidence. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 08/16/2010. (asp)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1518 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 1496 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney J. Elizabeth Haws and Alan L. Sullivan withdrawn from case for Sony Electronics. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 08/05/2010. (asp)
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1506 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 1350 Motion to Vacate ; granting in part and denying in part 1352 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 08/04/2010. (asp)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1442 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 1067 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 7/30/2010. (las)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1429 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER ON IN CAMERA INSPECTION OF PLAINTIFFS PRIVILEGE LOG.. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 07/26/2010. See order for details.(asp)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1415 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 668 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Nuffer on 07/21/2010. (asp)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1416 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 492 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Nuffer on 07/21/2010. (asp)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1411 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 1336 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Nuffer on 07/20/2010. (asp)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1375 MEMORANDUM DECISION adopting 636 Report and Recommendation of Speical Master except for his specific claims constructions for claims in the '414 and '767 patents ; denying as moot 667 SEALED Objections. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 07/09/2010. See order for details.(asp)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1362 MEMORANDUM DECISION overruling 1316 OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 06/29/2010. (asp)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1354 MEMORANDUM DECISION: Defendants' Objection (Docket No. 1254 ) to the Magistrate Judge's Order 3/22/2010 Memorandum Decision and Order Granting in Part Defendants' Motion to Compel Expert Discovery from Dr. Adams (Docket No. 1234 ) is OVERRULED. It is further ordered that ASUS' Objection (Docket No. 1255 ) to the Magistrate Judge's Order 3/22/2010 Memorandum Decision and Order Granting in Part Defendants' Motion to Compel Expert Discovery from Dr. Adams (Docket No. 1234 ) is OVERRULED. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 6/24/2010. (rlr)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1346 MEMORANDUM DECISION Overruling 1306 OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 06/24/2010. (asp)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1310 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 836 Motion for Sanctions; denying 836 Motion to Amend/Correct; finding as moot 897 Motion for Leave to File; finding as moot 997 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Nuffer on 05/26/2010. (asp)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1276 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 978 Motion to Compel ; granting 1014 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery ; denying 1016 Motion to Expedite ; granting in part and denying in part 1053 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Nuffer on 05/08/2010. (asp)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1241 MEMORANDUM DECISION ordering that within 14 days of the entry of this order, Plaintiff shall serve on Winbond an amended privilege log. It is further ORDERED that within 14 days of the entry of the order, Plaintiff shall submit the following document s for in camera review together with a copy of the amended privilege log: 1, 2, 21, 32, 33, 35, 36, 38, 40-41, 50, 69, 79, 83-85, 89, 92, 94, 123-24, 131, 164,175, 181, 184-88, 189, 190, 192-93, 195, 201-05, 207, 213, 219, 227, 233, 240, 243, 251, 25 9, 260-64, 274-75, 295-98, 297, 300-02, 309-11, 314-17, 319-20, 323-27, 330, 332, 339, 340, 345, 351, 354, 365-70, 375-76, 387, 388, and 392. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff may submit an optional proffer letter and declaration(s) with its mater ials for in camera review as set forth above. It is further ORDERED, that if a proffer letter and/or declaration(s) are submitted, Winbond may submit its optional response 14 days following service of Plaintiffs proffer letter. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs in camera materials and any response shall be served by hand-delivery to the undersigneds chambers, 350 South Main Street, Rm. 148, Salt LakeCity, Utah, clearly marked as SEALED FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW ONLY, and referencing the date of this order. Delivery of the in camera documents and any response shall be within business hours unless prior arrangements are made for chambers staff to accept delivery after business hours. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 03/29/2010. (asp)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1240 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 802 Motion to Compel interrogatory responses and production of documents. It is hereby ordered that Sonys motion to compel interrogatory responses and production of documents is DEN IED IN PART and GRANTED IN PART. On or before April 30, 2010, Adams will supplement its responses to interrogatories Nos. 4,5,7,12 and 25. Adams will not be required to produce documents requested in request for production No. 124. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Nuffer on 03/29/2010. (kpf)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1234 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 924 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Nuffer on 03/20/2010. (asp)
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1233 ORDER re 1227 Stipulation, filed by Sony Electronics, 1226 Stipulation, filed by Sony Electronics. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Nuffer on 03/19/2010. See order for details.(asp)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1232 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 870 Motion to Quash ; granting HP and Thi Las request to shift costs ; granting 903 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Nuffer on 03/17/2010. (asp)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1221 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 1211 Motion to Continue; Daubert Motions due by 07/19/2010, Motions in Limine due by 8/2/2010 by 5:00 p.m., Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/23/2010 03:00 PM in Room 142 before Judge Ted Stewart., Jury Trial reset for 9/8/2010 08:30 AM in Room 142 before Judge Ted Stewart. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 02/23/2010. (asp)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1207 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER denying 901 Motion to Bifurcate. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 1/14/2010. (kpf)
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 733 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 433 Motion to Dismiss ; denying 436 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 03/30/2009. (asp)
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 720 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 483 Motion for Clarification. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 3/3/09. (jwt)
October 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 638 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 312 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 10/09/2008. (asp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillip M. Adams & Associates, L.L.C. v. Lenovo International et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?