Island View Residential Treatment Center et al v. Kaiser Permanente et al
Plaintiff: Island View Residential Treatment Center, Andrew L., Thomas L. and Anna L.
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente and Kaiser Permanente Traditional Plan for Small Business
Case Number: 1:2009cv00003
Filed: January 12, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: Davis
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2009. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2009 Filing 26 RECEIPT: Notice of Transfer to Other District received at USDC No Dist of CA on 8/25/09. USDC No Dist CA case no. is CV 09 3921 BZ (alt)
August 21, 2009 Filing 25 NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL that case has been transferred to USDC No District of CA via US Mail. A copy of the Order and docket sheet were sent with this letter (alt)
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting #12 Motion to Change Venue/Case is transferred to USDC No Dist of CA - CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 8/21/09 (alt)
August 6, 2009 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Clark Waddoups: Motion Hearing held on 8/6/2009 re #12 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Kaiser Permanente Traditional Plan for Small Business, Kaiser Permanente. After hearing argument from counsel, the court GRANTS motion to change venue. The court will issue an order. Attorney for Plaintiff: Brian King, Esq., Attorney for Defendant Justin Hitt, Esq; Thomas Freeman, Esq. Court Reporter: Karen Murakami. (tab)
July 7, 2009 Filing 22 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, #12 MOTION to Change Venue : (Notice generated by Theresa Brown) Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2009 03:00 PM in Room 102 before Judge Clark Waddoups. (tab)
June 8, 2009 Filing 21 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #12 MOTION to Change Venue : (Notice generated by Theresa Brown) Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2009 03:00 PM in Room 102 before Judge Clark Waddoups. (tab)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER dismissing Island View Residential Treatment Center from this action. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 4/1/09 (alt)
March 31, 2009 Filing 19 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff Island View Residential Treatment Center, LLC (Corrected Copy) by Kaiser Permanente, Kaiser Permanente Traditional Plan for Small Business. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hitt, H.)
March 31, 2009 Filing 18 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff Island View Residential Treatment Center, LLC by Kaiser Permanente, Kaiser Permanente Traditional Plan for Small Business. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hitt, H.)
March 24, 2009 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Defendants Kaiser Permanente, Kaiser Permanente Traditional Plan for Small Business. (Hitt, H.)
March 18, 2009 Filing 16 Amended MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Plaintiffs Andrew L., Island View Residential Treatment Center, Anna L., Thomas L.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, part I to group health plan, #2 Exhibit A, part II to group health plan, #3 Exhibit Order in Carlo B. v. BCBS Mass)(King, Brian)
March 17, 2009 Filing 15 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Plaintiffs Andrew L., Island View Residential Treatment Center, Anna L., Thomas L.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit part i of Kaiser group health plan, #2 Exhibit part II to Kaiser group health plan)(King, Brian)
March 6, 2009 Filing 14 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #11 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint (Amended Exhibit in Support of Motion) filed by Defendants Kaiser Permanente, Kaiser Permanente Traditional Plan for Small Business. (Hitt, H.)
February 27, 2009 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Defendants Kaiser Permanente, Kaiser Permanente Traditional Plan for Small Business. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Borje-Bonkowski Declaration, #2 Exhibit Valentine Declaration, #3 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice)(Hitt, H.)
February 27, 2009 Filing 12 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Defendants Kaiser Permanente, Kaiser Permanente Traditional Plan for Small Business. (Hitt, H.)
February 27, 2009 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Defendants Kaiser Permanente, Kaiser Permanente Traditional Plan for Small Business. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Borje-Bonkowski Declaration, #2 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice)(Hitt, H.)
February 27, 2009 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Defendants Kaiser Permanente, Kaiser Permanente Traditional Plan for Small Business. (Hitt, H.)
February 18, 2009 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew L., Island View Residential Treatment Center, Anna L., Thomas L. as to Kaiser Permanente Traditional Plan for Small Business served on 1/28/2009, answer due 2/27/2009. (King, Brian)
February 18, 2009 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew L., Island View Residential Treatment Center, Anna L., Thomas L. as to Kaiser Permanente served on 1/28/2009, answer due 2/27/2009. (King, Brian)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas Michael Freeman for Kaiser Permanente and Kaiser Permanente Traditional Plan for Small Business. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 2/13/09 (alt)
February 9, 2009 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas M. Freeman, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 10880000000000834070, filed by Defendant Kaiser Permanente. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Application, Order, and E File consent)(Hitt, H.)
January 13, 2009 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Judge Clark Waddoups. Judge Ted Stewart no longer assigned to the case. Case number will now read 1:09-cv-00003-CW. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (blk)
January 12, 2009 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Kaiser Permanente Traditional Plan for Small Business. Counsel should print the issued summons for service. (jlw)
January 12, 2009 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Kaiser Permanente. Counsel should print the issued summons for service. (jlw)
January 12, 2009 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against all defendants (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 10880000000000817362), filed by Andrew L., Island View Residential Treatment Center, Anna L., Thomas L.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Ted Stewart (King, Brian)
January 12, 2009 Filing 1 Case has been opened and assigned to Judge Ted Stewart. Plaintiffs Andrew L., Island View Residential Treatment Center, Anna L., Thomas L. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 350 by the end of the business day. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (jlw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Island View Residential Treatment Center et al v. Kaiser Permanente et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Island View Residential Treatment Center
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Nicole T. Durrant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew L.
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Nicole T. Durrant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas L.
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Nicole T. Durrant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna L.
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Nicole T. Durrant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente
Represented By: Thomas Michael Freeman
Represented By: H. Justin Hitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente Traditional Plan for Small Business
Represented By: Thomas Michael Freeman
Represented By: H. Justin Hitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?