Icon Health & Fitness v. Park City Entertainment

Plaintiff: Icon Health & Fitness
Defendant: Park City Entertainment
Case Number: 1:2010cv00195
Filed: November 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Northern Office
County: Cache
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Kimball
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 35:0271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION- SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Status Conference set for 11/19/2014 02:00 PM in Rm 7.300 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 11/13/2014. (las)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 97 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 106 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 08/07/2013. (tls)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER overruling 163 Objections; granting in part and denying in part 169 Motion to Strike; denying 169 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 7/10/13 (alt)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 147 Motion to Strike; denying 147 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 02/14/2013. (tls)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 78 Motion to Stay and Administratively Closing this Case. Case may be reopened upon notification of the conclusion of the reexamination process. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to case. 72 ORDER granting Motion to Consolidate Cases is VACATED: case 2:10cv1264 BSJ has been reopened and will proceed before Judge Bruce Jenkins. All consolidated parties are terminated as to this case. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 11/1/11 (alt)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 9 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment;denying 13 Motion for Sanctions; denying 24 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 45 Motion to Strike; granting 55 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 7/5/11 (alt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Icon Health & Fitness v. Park City Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Icon Health & Fitness
Represented By: Seth W. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park City Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?