Nunez et al v. Nunez et al

Plaintiff: Christy Marie Rice and Jennifer Ellen Nunez
Defendant: Michael Kevin Nunez, Jr. and Raynie Nunez
Case Number: 1:2013cv00126
Filed: September 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Northern Office
County: Davis
Presiding Judge: Ted Stewart
Presiding Judge: Brooke C. Wells
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 38 Motion to Amend/Correct Default Judgment to Include Appointment of Scott N. Rasmussen as Permanent Successor Trustee of the Nunez Family Revocable Inter Vivos Trust. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 4/25/14. (ss) Modified by marking this order as a memorandum decision on 4/25/2014 (rks).
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDERgranting 35 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 4/21/14. (ss)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave of Court to File Amended Complaint.. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 12/23/13. (ss)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - ORDERED that the reserved argument of Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction 4 is GRANTED. At the request of Plaintiffs, the Court has appointed by separate order Scott N. Rasmussen to serve as successor trustee of the Nunez Family Trust. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 10/2/13. (ss)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 10 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 09/19/2013. (asp)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 4 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 9/12/13. (ss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunez et al v. Nunez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kevin Nunez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raynie Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Marie Rice
Represented By: S. Grace Acosta
Represented By: Dustin D. Gibb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Ellen Nunez
Represented By: Dustin D. Gibb
Represented By: S. Grace Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?