Marland et al v. Asplundh Tree Expert
Plaintiff: Scott K. Marland and Jennifer D. Marland
Defendant: Asplundh Tree Expert
Case Number: 1:2014cv00040
Filed: April 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Northern Office
County: Davis
Presiding Judge: Brooke C. Wells
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 269 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 234 Plaintiffs' Motion for Inclusion of Pre-Judgment Interest, Post-Judgment Interest and Costs in the Final Judgment; denying 250 Defendant's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, or in the Alternative, Motion for a New Trial or Remittitur. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 6/15/2017. (eat)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 251 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 229 Motion to Stay Execution of Judgment and Motion for Approval of Supersedeas Bond. The bond in the amount of $3,414,878.00, attached to Defendant's Motion for Stay as Exhibit A is approved. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 3/23/2017. (eat)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 225 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 2/23/2017. (eat)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - It is Ordered that Defendant's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law is Denied. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 2/16/2017. (las)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine Nos. 10 and 17 (Docket Nos. 139 and 179 ). Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 2/3/2017. (eat)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 152 Motion in Limine No. 11 Re: Bountiful City Light & Power Internal Policy on Cycle Pruning. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 2/1/2017. (eat)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 129 Motion in Limine Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 1/27/17. (jlw)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 70 Motion to Exclude. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 01/13/17. (jlw)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying Defendant's Corrected 74 Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs' Experts from Testifying at Trial that J.S.M. will be Unable to Study Science or Mathematics in College or Attend Graduate School. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 1/10/2017. (eat)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 71 Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Experts that J.S.M. Will Need Twenty Additional Surgeries and Laser Therapy in the Future. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 12/27/2016. (eat)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE IMPROPER OPINIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S REBUTTAL EXPERT. Denying 76 Motion to Exclude. It is therefore ordered that Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Improper Opinions of Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Expert is DENIED. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 12/21/2016. (kpf)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 73 Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs' Counsel at Trial from Inquiring into Dr. Carol Anderson's Expert Opinions in Unrelated Litigation. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 12/20/2016. (eat)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 54 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 12/14/2016. (eat)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 43 Motion to Take Second Deposition of Minor Plaintiff J.S.M. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 9/1/2016. (eat)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marland et al v. Asplundh Tree Expert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott K. Marland
Represented By: Scott W. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer D. Marland
Represented By: Scott W. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asplundh Tree Expert
Represented By: Julianne P. Blanch
Represented By: Tsutomu L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?