McDaniels v. Goff et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Wayne McDaniels
Defendant: FNU Goff, Tim Scott, Mike Caldwell, Ogden County Prosecutor's Office, Federal Bureau of Investigation and William Kendal
Case Number: 1:2014cv00124
Filed: October 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Northern Office
County: Weber
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER ADOPTING 95 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to 86 Motion to Dismiss: the case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 1/24/17 (alt)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 55 Motion for Service of Process (Prisoner). The United States Marshals Service shall serve a summons, a copy of Plaintiffs complaint, and a copy of this Order upon AUSA for Defendants Federal Bureau of Investigation, William Kendal; denying 56 Motion to Produce; finding as moot 57 Motion for Teleconference; denying 64 Motion to Strike; denying 69 Motion for Reimbursement; finding as moot 70 Motion for Teleconference; denying 71 Motion for Production; denying 72 Motion for Dfts to Contact SC AUSA; denying 74 Motion re Obstruction of Justice; denying 76 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/23/16 (alt)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; denying 49 Motion ; denying 50 Motion for Entry of Default; denying 51 Motion for Entry of Default; denying 29 Motion ; denying 30 Motion ; denying 31 Motion ; denying 33 Motion. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 9/14/15. (jlw)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting 39 Motion to Strike, granting 42 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; finding as moot 46 Motion for Hearing; granting in part 32 Motion for Teleconference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/24/2015. (blh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDaniels v. Goff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Wayne McDaniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ogden County Prosecutor's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Kendal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?