Woolf v. Liberty Mutual Group
Plaintiff: |
Judy Woolf |
Defendant: |
Liberty Mutual Group and Shaela K. Wiggington |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv00168 |
Filed: |
December 16, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Utah |
Office: |
Northern Office |
County: |
Box Elder |
Presiding Judge: |
Dustin B. Pead |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 17, 2015 |
Filing
54
MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order-denying as moot 41 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying as moot 48 Motion to Strike ; granting 19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 9/16/15. (jmr)
|
September 11, 2015 |
Filing
53
MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 37 Motion to Deposit Funds; granting 38 Motion for Interpleader. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that:1. Liberty Lifes Motion for Interpleader [Docket No. 38] is GRANTED; 2. Liberty Life As surance Company of Bostons Motion for Leave to Deposit Funds [DocketNo. 37] is GRANTED;3. Liberty Life shall deposit the sum of $180,000.00, plus any applicable accrued interest,into the Court registry;4. The funds shall be deposited by the Clerk of Court into an interest-bearing account;5. Ms. Wigginton and Ms. Woolf are enjoined and restrained from instituting any otherproceeding against Liberty Life with respect to the Policy;6. In the event that it is determined that any other person not yet joined as a party to thisaction may make a claim for, or be entitled to, the funds at issue in this matter, thatperson is joined and subjected to paragraph 5 of this Order;7. Liberty Life is fully and finally discharged from all liability under the relevant policy andDISMISSED from this action;8. Liberty Life shall be awarded its reasonable attorneys fees and costs from the policyproceeds pursuant to 29 U.S.C. § 1132(g). Liberty Life shall file a Motion for AttorneysFees and Costs by September 24, 2015 and shall also file and email a proposed Order. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 9/11/2015. (jwt)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?