Ault v. CenturyLink et al

Plaintiff: Brian C. Ault
Defendant: CenturyLink, Qwest, Communications Workers of America and CWA Local 7705
Case Number: 1:2015cv00002
Filed: January 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Northern Office
County: Cache
Presiding Judge: Paul M. Warner
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 41 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; and granting 48 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case forthwith. Defendants' request for attorneys' fees is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 7/11/2016. (eat)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 33 Motion to Remand; finding as moot 39 Motion to Vacate ; granting 32 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 4/5/16. (jlw)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER denying 16 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 6/15/2015. (blh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ault v. CenturyLink et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian C. Ault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CenturyLink
Represented By: Karen H. DuWaldt
Represented By: Justin P. Matkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qwest
Represented By: Karen H. DuWaldt
Represented By: Justin P. Matkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Communications Workers of America
Represented By: Richard Rosenblatt
Represented By: Arthur F. Sandack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CWA Local 7705
Represented By: Richard Rosenblatt
Represented By: Arthur F. Sandack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?