Brewer v. Thompson et al
Plaintiff: |
Jordan Alan Neves Brewer |
Defendant: |
Terry Thompson, Kevin Burton, Joseph Porter, Keri Sekulich, Jeremy Miller, Jordan Bonyai and Pat Collingsworth |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv00040 |
Filed: |
February 26, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Utah |
Office: |
Northern Office |
County: |
Weber |
Presiding Judge: |
Tena Campbell |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 1, 2020 |
Filing
247
Memorandum & Decision & Order; granting in part and denying in part 223 Motion for Summary Judgment; 1. All requests for injunctive relief are DISMISSED as moot, Plaintiff having been transferred from custody of Davis and Webe r Counties.2. Plaintiff's claim of lack fo meaningful grievance review is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. 3. Based on qualified immunity, the individuals defendants' summary judgment motion i s GRANTED.4. As to defendants Davis and Weber Counties, Summary Judgment on the inadequate-medical treatment claim is GRANTED; this results in Davis County's dismissal from the case. meanwhile, summary judgment for Weber County on the Book- donations and mail policies is DENIED for now. 5. Plaintiff must within thirty days show a willingness to further prosecute this case by updating his address with the Court. Failure to respond will result in dismissal of the remaining claims. Once it has heard from plaintiff, the Court will set parameters for further litigation of the remaining claims. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 06/01/2020. (kpf)
|
September 25, 2019 |
Filing
246
MEMORANDUM DECISION & Order granting Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Ninth Claim for Relief. Granting 217 Motion to Dismiss. Claim nine based on RLUIPA is DISMISSED with prejudice, under Rule 12(b)(6), for failure to state a claim ob which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 09/24/2019. (kpf)
|
July 10, 2018 |
Filing
210
MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF PROCESS OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT & DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS(3) Order:denied as moot 195 Motion to Strike; granting 199 Motion to Amend/Correct; The Clerk of Court Shall file Plainti ff's Second Amended Complaint; The USMS shall serve a completed summons, a copy of the Second Amended Complaint, and serve a copy of this Order upon the above listed defendants. Denying 205 Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting 207 Motion to Stay. The Court sees no need for further discovery at this time, but will also continually re-evaluate discovery needs on its own and direct further discovery if deemed necessary. For the time being, Defendant may discard any discover requests from Plaintiff. PLAINTIFF SHALL NOT FILE ANY MOTIONS IN THIS CASE UNTIL AFTER DEFENDANTS FILE THEIR SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION; PLAINTIFF THEN WILL BE LIMITED TO ONE MOTION OF FIVE PAGES OR LESS, IF HE CHOOSES TO FILE A MOTION AT THAT TIME. ANY OTHER MOTIONS ATTEMPTED BY PLAINTIFF WILL NOT BE FILED BY THE COURT, BUT WILL BE RETURNED TO SENDER. MOTIONS FOR EXTENSION WILL BE DISFAVORED IN THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 07/09/2018. (kpf)
|
April 28, 2017 |
Filing
132
MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS OF DEFENDANTS PERRY, WOOD, AND RUSSELL: finding as moot 47 Motion to Stay; granting 62 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 71 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 108 Motion to Strike; finding as moot 118 Motion to Stay. Defendants Perry, Russell and Wood are DISMISSED from this case. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 04/28/2017. (kpf)
|
June 3, 2016 |
Filing
13
MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF PROCESS and DISPOSITIVE MOTION granting 10 Motion for court screening; granting 10 Motion for Service of Process (Prisoner). The United States Marshals Service shall serve a s ummons, a copy of Plaintiffs complaint, and a copy of this Order upon Defendants Jordan Bonyai, Kevin Burton, Pat Collingsworth, FNU Jensen, FNU Manfull, Jeremy Miller, Sheila Perry, Joseph Porter, Todd Richardson, Richard Russel, Keri Sekulich, Terry Thompson, John Wood. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 06/03/2016. (kpf)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?