Icon Health & Fitness v. ConsumerAffairs.com et al
Plaintiff: Icon Health & Fitness
Defendant: ConsumerAffairs.com, Consumers Unified and David Zachary Carman
Case Number: 1:2016cv00168
Filed: December 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Northern Office
County: Cache
Presiding Judge: Dustin B. Pead
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 49 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b); denying 53 Motion to Amend and Certify Court's Memorandum Decision for Permissive Appeal to the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 5/8/2018. (las)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiffs claims of defamation, violation of the Utah Unfair Competition Act, violation of Utah Consumer Sales Practices Act, intentional interference with economic relations, and civil RICO are dismissed without prejudice. The remainder of Defendants motion is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/6/2018. (las)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The court denies Defendants motion with regard to Plaintiffs Utah Unfair Competition claim. Additionally, the cou rt orders Plaintiff to provide a more definite statement of its Utah Consumer Sales Practices Act claim. Plaintiffs remaining claims are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within twenty-one (21) days of the courts order.Further, if Plaintiff fails to provide a more definite statement of its Utah Consumer Sales Practices Act claim within twenty-one (21) days, that claim will also be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 6/22/2017. (las)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Icon Health & Fitness v. ConsumerAffairs.com et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Icon Health & Fitness
Represented By: Bradley H. Bearnson
Represented By: Aaron K. Bergman
Represented By: Wayne K. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConsumerAffairs.com
Represented By: Randy L. Dryer
Represented By: Richard E. Mrazik
Represented By: Cameron Altman Stracher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumers Unified
Represented By: Randy L. Dryer
Represented By: Richard E. Mrazik
Represented By: Cameron Altman Stracher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Zachary Carman
Represented By: Randy L. Dryer
Represented By: Richard E. Mrazik
Represented By: Cameron Altman Stracher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?