Stella et al v. Davis County et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Stella and Estate of Heather Miller, The
Defendant: Davis County, Todd Richardson, Mavin Anderson and James Ondricek
Case Number: 1:2018cv00002
Filed: January 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Northern Office
County: Davis
Presiding Judge: Jill N. Parrish
Presiding Judge: Dustin B. Pead
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 244 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER : The Court holds that defendant Anderson is not entitled to qualified immunity. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 9/13/2022. (alf)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying as moot in part 228 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. The court DENIES AS MOOT Defendants motion for judgment as a matter of law regarding punitive damages. The court GRANTS Defendants motion for judgment in its favor as a matter of law on Stellas state constitutional claim. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 8/1/22. (alf)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 217 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 202 Motion to Appoint Expert - the court GRANTS Plaintiffs' motion to substitute expert Nurse Schultz with Patricia McQuillen, RN. However, Nurse McQuillen may not testify as to whether the alleged failure to provide adequate medical care stemmed from discriminatory prejudice. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 07/13/2022. (jl)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 07/12/2022. (lwh)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 182 Motion for Amended Scheduling Order ; denying 182 Motion Reconsider Precluding Evidence; denying 185 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 186 Motion in Limine; denying 187 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 188 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/1/22. (alf)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 99 Motion in Limine to Exclude the Attorney General's Declination Letter. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 3/14/22. (alf)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER denying 61 Motion to Amend Judgment. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 9/21/2020. (nl)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 54 Defendants Motion for leave to file objections to declarations; denying 31 Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 42 Defendants Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 9/23/2019. (jds)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stella et al v. Davis County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Stella
Represented By: Daniel M. Baczynski
Represented By: Tad D. Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Heather Miller, The
Represented By: Daniel M. Baczynski
Represented By: Tad D. Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mavin Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Ondricek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?