Eyre et al v. Lemmel et al
Plaintiff: Jarrod LaMar, Luke B. Eyre, Nathan D. Nearman and Hugo Alcarez
Defendant: Tara Lemmel, Otis Carroll, Jr Floyd T. Williams, Harold L. Gibson, Free Movie Project, Todd Williams, Melvin Doug Anderson, Rose Heights Church, Willard Stanback, Carrol & Kelley Ireland PC, Nakendrick Foxx, Eastar Investment, FMP Productions, Kevin G. Lee and Wendi Lee
Case Number: 1:2018cv00095
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Northern Office
County: Weber
Presiding Judge: Bruce S Jenkins
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #23 MOTION Injunctive Relief and Memorandum in Support. Responses due by 10/3/2018 Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 9/4/2018. (las)
August 31, 2018 Filing 35 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Injunctive Relief and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Melvin Doug Anderson, FMP Productions, Nakendrick Foxx, Free Movie Project, Harold L. Gibson, Kevin G. Lee, Wendi Lee, Rose Heights Church, Willard Stanback. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shumway, Douglas) Modified on 9/4/2018 by correcting motion type (las).
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #23 MOTION Injunctive Relief and Memorandum in Support Responses due by 10/3/2018 Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 8/30/2018. (las)
August 30, 2018 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM in Further Support re #23 MOTION Injunctive Relief and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Luke B. Eyre. (las)
August 30, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 MOTION Injuctive Relief and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Carrol & Kelley Ireland PC, Otis Carroll, Eastar Investment, Tara Lemmel, Floyd T. Williams, Todd Williams. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, John)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Melvin Doug Anderson answer due 10/3/2018; FMP Productions answer due 10/3/2018; Nakendrick Foxx answer due 10/3/2018; Free Movie Project answer due 10/3/2018; Harold L. Gibson answer due 10/3/2018; Kevin G. Lee answer due 10/3/2018; Wendi Lee answer due 10/3/2018; Rose Heights Church answer due 10/3/2018; Willard Stanback answer due 10/3/2018. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 8/29/2018. (las)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Willard A. Stanback for Melvin Doug Anderson,Willard A. Stanback for FMP Productions,Willard A. Stanback for Nakendrick Foxx,Willard A. Stanback for Free Movie Project,Willard A. Stanback for Harold L. Gibson,Willard A. Stanback for Kevin G. Lee,Willard A. Stanback for Wendi Lee,Willard A. Stanback for Rose Heights Church,Willard A. Stanback for Willard Stanback. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 8/28/2018. (las)
August 28, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time time to response to complaint filed by Defendants Melvin Doug Anderson, FMP Productions, Nakendrick Foxx, Free Movie Project, Harold L. Gibson, Kevin G. Lee, Wendi Lee. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harrison, Peter) Modified on 8/29/2018 by correcting motion type (las).
August 28, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE OF FILING of Proposed Order re #23 MOTION Injuctive Relief and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Luke B. Eyre. (las)
August 28, 2018 Filing 27 Additional EXHIBITS filed by Luke B. Eyre re #23 MOTION Injuctive Relief and Memorandum in Support. (las)
August 27, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Willard A. Stanback , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3089570, filed by Defendants Melvin Doug Anderson, FMP Productions, Nakendrick Foxx, Free Movie Project, Harold L. Gibson, Kevin G. Lee, Wendi Lee, Rose Heights Church, Willard Stanback. (Attachments: #1 Application for Pro Hac Vice, #2 E Case filing registration form, #3 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Peter H. Harrison added to party Melvin Doug Anderson(pty:dft), Attorney Peter H. Harrison added to party FMP Productions(pty:dft), Attorney Peter H. Harrison added to party Nakendrick Foxx(pty:dft), Attorney Peter H. Harrison added to party Free Movie Project(pty:dft), Attorney Peter H. Harrison added to party Harold L. Gibson(pty:dft), Attorney Peter H. Harrison added to party Kevin G. Lee(pty:dft), Attorney Peter H. Harrison added to party Wendi Lee(pty:dft), Attorney Peter H. Harrison added to party Rose Heights Church(pty:dft), Attorney Peter H. Harrison added to party Willard Stanback(pty:dft)(Harrison, Peter)
August 24, 2018 Filing 25 After review of the case, case reassigned to District Judge per 24 Docket Text Order. Case randomly assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (las)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to court policy, Plaintiff's filing of a motion for injunctive relief #23 renders this case ineligible for consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge. Accordingly, the court orders that this case be reassigned to a district judge through random reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 08/23/2018. (amn)
August 23, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION for Injunctive Relief and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Luke B. Eyre. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit X, #27 Exhibit Y, #28 Exhibit Z, #29 Exhibit AA, #30 Exhibit BB, #31 Exhibit CC, #32 Exhibit DD, #33 Exhibit EE, #34 Exhibit FF)(las) NOTE- Exhibits were provided to the court on a flash drive. Modified on 8/31/2018 by correcting text (las). Modified on 9/5/2018 added note about exhibits. (las).
August 23, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Adam Wright on behalf of Carrol & Kelley Ireland PC, Otis Carroll, Eastar Investment, Tara Lemmel, Floyd T. Williams, Todd Williams (Wright, J.)
August 23, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Ushio Frandsen on behalf of Carrol & Kelley Ireland PC, Otis Carroll, Eastar Investment, Tara Lemmel, Floyd T. Williams, Todd Williams (Frandsen, Nicholas)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Carrol & Kelley Ireland PC answer due 10/3/2018; Otis Carroll answer due 10/3/2018; Eastar Investment answer due 10/3/2018; Tara Lemmel answer due 10/3/2018; Floyd T. Williams answer due 10/3/2018; Todd Williams answer due 10/3/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/23/2018. (las)
August 23, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer / Response to Complaint filed by Defendants Carrol & Kelley Ireland PC, Otis Carroll, Eastar Investment, Tara Lemmel, Floyd T. Williams, Todd Williams. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney John L. Cooper added to party Carrol & Kelley Ireland PC(pty:dft), Attorney John L. Cooper added to party Otis Carroll(pty:dft), Attorney John L. Cooper added to party Eastar Investment(pty:dft), Attorney John L. Cooper added to party Tara Lemmel(pty:dft), Attorney John L. Cooper added to party Floyd T. Williams(pty:dft), Attorney John L. Cooper added to party Todd Williams(pty:dft)(Cooper, John)
August 8, 2018 Filing 18 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Rose Heights Church. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 8, 2018 Filing 17 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Carrol & Kelley Ireland PC. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 8, 2018 Filing 16 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to FMP Productions. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 8, 2018 Filing 15 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Free Movie Project. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 8, 2018 Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Melvin Doug Anderson. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 8, 2018 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Floyd T. Williams. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 8, 2018 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Todd Williams. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 8, 2018 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Eastar Investment. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 8, 2018 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Kevin G. Lee. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 8, 2018 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Wendi Lee. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 8, 2018 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Willard Stanback. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 8, 2018 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Tara Lemmel. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 8, 2018 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Otis Carroll. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 8, 2018 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Nakendrick Foxx. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 8, 2018 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Harold L. Gibson. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET TEXT ORDER. Plaintiff Luke Eyre seeks to consolidate this matter with Eastar Investment v. Synergy Holding Solutions, 2:18-cv-00615. That case, however, was recently remanded to state court and is closed. Accordingly, consolidation is not possible and Plaintiff's motion #2 is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 08/06/2018. No attached document. (amn)
August 3, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Plaintiff Luke B. Eyre. (las)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4681082866) (Fee Status: Paid) filed by Nathan D. Nearman, Luke B. Eyre, Hugo Alcarez, Jarrod LaMar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eyre et al v. Lemmel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Lemmel
Represented By: J. Adam Wright
Represented By: Nicholas Ushio Frandsen
Represented By: John L. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otis Carroll
Represented By: J. Adam Wright
Represented By: Nicholas Ushio Frandsen
Represented By: John L. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jr Floyd T. Williams
Represented By: J. Adam Wright
Represented By: Nicholas Ushio Frandsen
Represented By: John L. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold L. Gibson
Represented By: Willard A. Stanback
Represented By: Peter H. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Free Movie Project
Represented By: Willard A. Stanback
Represented By: Peter H. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Williams
Represented By: J. Adam Wright
Represented By: Nicholas Ushio Frandsen
Represented By: John L. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin Doug Anderson
Represented By: Willard A. Stanback
Represented By: Peter H. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Heights Church
Represented By: Willard A. Stanback
Represented By: Peter H. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willard Stanback
Represented By: Willard A. Stanback
Represented By: Peter H. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrol & Kelley Ireland PC
Represented By: J. Adam Wright
Represented By: Nicholas Ushio Frandsen
Represented By: John L. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nakendrick Foxx
Represented By: Willard A. Stanback
Represented By: Peter H. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastar Investment
Represented By: J. Adam Wright
Represented By: Nicholas Ushio Frandsen
Represented By: John L. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMP Productions
Represented By: Willard A. Stanback
Represented By: Peter H. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin G. Lee
Represented By: Willard A. Stanback
Represented By: Peter H. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendi Lee
Represented By: Willard A. Stanback
Represented By: Peter H. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarrod LaMar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke B. Eyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan D. Nearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugo Alcarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?