Brown v. Wal-Mart Stores

Plaintiff: Dawn Brown
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores
Case Number: 1:2018cv00131
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: Utah District Court
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 15 DOCKET TEXT ORDER: The parties are ORDERED to comply with Paragraph 2 of the Order to Propose Schedule #4 within fourteen (14) days. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 12/13/2018. (nas)
October 26, 2018 14 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint filed by Wal-Mart Stores.(Rice, Mitchel)
October 26, 2018 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Plaintiff Dawn Brown, Defendant Wal-Mart Stores. (las)
October 26, 2018 12 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Dawn Brown. (las)
October 24, 2018 11 File Received from Second District Court - Ogden, Weber County consisting of docket sheet and documents filed in state court. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 Return of Service) (las)
October 24, 2018 10 Modification of Docket: re #9 Amended Complaint. Docket text has been modified to reflect complaint is filed against defendants rather than plaintiff: answer records corrected. (las)
October 23, 2018 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Dawn Brown. (Gibbons, Robert) Modified on 10/24/2018 by correcting text to show complaint is filed against defendants not plaintiffs (las).
October 16, 2018 8 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Wal-Mart Stores. (las)
October 16, 2018 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores. (Rice, Mitchel)
October 16, 2018 6 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Wal-Mart Stores. Form due by 10/31/2018. (tlh)
October 16, 2018 5 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Dawn Brown, Defendant Wal-Mart Stores. (tlh)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 10/16/2018. (las)
October 15, 2018 3 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Wal-Mart Stores.(Rice, Mitchel)
October 15, 2018 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3124464) filed by Wal-Mart Stores. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Summons) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Rice, Mitchel)
October 15, 2018 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Defendant Wal-Mart Stores is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Wal-Mart Stores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores
Represented By: Marianne Schumann
Represented By: Andrea M. Keysar
Represented By: Mitchel T. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Brown
Represented By: Robert W. Gibbons
Represented By: Lindy W. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?