McFarlin et al v. Box Elder County et al

Plaintiff: Nehemiah McFarlin and Atoatasi Fox
Defendant: Box Elder County Sheriffs Office, L. Maughan, Steven Berry, Jeff Semrad, Box Elder County, Shane Nebeker, Patsy Sherman, Z. Moore, Adam Walker, Justin Zilles, Oneida County Sheriffs Office and Oneida County
Case Number: 1:2018cv00156
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: Utah District Court
0 Judge: Evelyn J Furse
1 Judge: Dale A Kimball
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 22 After review of the case, case reassigned to a District Judge per #21 Attorney Planning Meeting Report. One or more of the parties requested reassignment to a district judge. per Case randomly assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse no longer assigned to the case. (las)
January 31, 2019 21 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hamilton, R.)
January 30, 2019 20 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Steven Berry, Box Elder County, Box Elder County Sheriffs Office, L. Maughan, Z. Moore. (las)
January 15, 2019 19 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Steven Berry, Box Elder County, Box Elder County Sheriffs Office, L. Maughan, Z. Moore, Oneida County, Oneida County Sheriffs Office, Jeff Semrad, Patsy Sherman, Plaintiffs Atoatasi Fox, Nehemiah McFarlin. Form due by 1/30/2019. (las)
January 15, 2019 18 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Steven Berry, Box Elder County, Box Elder County Sheriffs Office, L. Maughan, Z. Moore, Oneida County, Oneida County Sheriffs Office, Jeff Semrad, Patsy Sherman, Plaintiffs Atoatasi Fox, Nehemiah McFarlin. (las)
January 14, 2019 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Oneida County, Oneida County Sheriffs Office, Jeff Semrad, Patsy Sherman.(Hall, Blake)
January 11, 2019 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Steven Berry, Box Elder County, Box Elder County Sheriffs Office, L. Maughan, Z. Moore. Attorney R. Blake Hamilton added to party Steven Berry(pty:dft), Attorney R. Blake Hamilton added to party Box Elder County(pty:dft), Attorney R. Blake Hamilton added to party Box Elder County Sheriffs Office(pty:dft), Attorney R. Blake Hamilton added to party L. Maughan(pty:dft), Attorney R. Blake Hamilton added to party Z. Moore(pty:dft)(Hamilton, R.)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sam L. Angell for Oneida County,Sam L. Angell for Oneida County Sheriffs Office,Sam L. Angell for Jeff Semrad,Sam L. Angell for Patsy Sherman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 1/8/2019. (las)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Blake G. Hall for Oneida County,Blake G. Hall for Oneida County Sheriffs Office,Blake G. Hall for Jeff Semrad,Blake G. Hall for Patsy Sherman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 1/8/2019. (las)
January 8, 2019 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Atoatasi Fox, Nehemiah McFarlin as to All Defendants. (Rammell, Bron)
January 8, 2019 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Atoatasi Fox, Nehemiah McFarlin as to All Defendants. (Rammell, Bron)
January 7, 2019 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sam L. Angell , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3177009, filed by Defendants Oneida County, Oneida County Sheriffs Office, Jeff Semrad, Patsy Sherman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Noel, Stephen)
January 7, 2019 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Blake G. Hall , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3176996, filed by Defendants Oneida County, Oneida County Sheriffs Office, Jeff Semrad, Patsy Sherman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Stephen F. Noel added to party Oneida County(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen F. Noel added to party Oneida County Sheriffs Office(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen F. Noel added to party Jeff Semrad(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen F. Noel added to party Patsy Sherman(pty:dft)(Noel, Stephen)
December 21, 2018 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Oneida County Sheriffs Office. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
December 21, 2018 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Oneida County. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
December 21, 2018 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Box Elder County. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
December 21, 2018 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Box Elder County Sheriffs Office. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bron M. Rammell for Atoatasi Fox,Bron M. Rammell for Nehemiah McFarlin. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 12/19/2018. (las)
December 17, 2018 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bron Rammell , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3166245, filed by Plaintiffs Atoatasi Fox, Nehemiah McFarlin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit E-filing Application, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Steele, Daniel)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 12/6/2018. (las)
December 5, 2018 2 COMPLAINT (JURY TRIAL DEMANDED) against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3159132) filed by Atoatasi Fox, Nehemiah McFarlin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Steele, Daniel)
December 5, 2018 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Plaintiffs Atoatasi Fox and Nehemiah McFarlin are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McFarlin et al v. Box Elder County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Box Elder County Sheriffs Office
Represented By: R. Blake Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Maughan
Represented By: R. Blake Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Berry
Represented By: R. Blake Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Semrad
Represented By: Sam L. Angell
Represented By: Blake G. Hall
Represented By: Stephen F. Noel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Box Elder County
Represented By: R. Blake Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Nebeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patsy Sherman
Represented By: Sam L. Angell
Represented By: Blake G. Hall
Represented By: Stephen F. Noel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z. Moore
Represented By: R. Blake Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Zilles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oneida County Sheriffs Office
Represented By: Sam L. Angell
Represented By: Blake G. Hall
Represented By: Stephen F. Noel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oneida County
Represented By: Sam L. Angell
Represented By: Blake G. Hall
Represented By: Stephen F. Noel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nehemiah McFarlin
Represented By: Grant M. Sumsion
Represented By: Daniel L. Steele
Represented By: Bron M. Rammell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atoatasi Fox
Represented By: Grant M. Sumsion
Represented By: Daniel L. Steele
Represented By: Bron M. Rammell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?