Harris Research, Inc. et al v. Knobloch
Petitioner: Nhance Inc and Harris Research, Inc.
Respondent: Kevin Knobloch
Case Number: 1:2018cv00162
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0009
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION in favor of Harris Research, Inc., Nhance Inc against Kevin Knobloch: Plaintiffs are entitled to judgment against Defendant of their arbitration fees, attorney's fees and costs, in the total amount of $10,000.00, to accrue interest at the federal judgment rate. Plaintiffs are also entitled to recover reasonable attorney fees and costs hereafter incurred in collecting the Judgment amount - CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 2/6/19. (alt)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Confirm 10/19/2018 Arbitration Award. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 2/6/19 (alt)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Harris Research, Inc., Nhance Inc re #2 Plaintiff's MOTION to Affirm Arbitration Award and Memorandum in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service)(Francis, Lewis)
December 17, 2018 NAME CORRECTION of Kevin Knoblock. Corrected Name: Kevin Knobloch. Refer to document number: #2 . Name was entered incorrectly at case opening. (rks)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 Plaintiff's MOTION to Affirm Arbitration Award and Memorandum in Support filed by Petitioners Harris Research, Inc., Nhance Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Stipulated Arbitration Award, #3 Exhibit B - April 7, 2011 Franchise Agreement, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Lewis M. Francis, #5 Exhibit D - Proposed Order Confirming Arbitration Award, #6 Exhibit E - Proposed Order-Judgment & Injunction, #7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Confirming Arbitration Award, #8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Judgment & Injunction)(Francis, Lewis)
December 17, 2018 Civil Case Filing Fee for Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award received from Petitioners Harris Research, Inc., Nhance Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3165913). (Francis, Lewis)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. Petitioners Harris Research, Inc., Nhance Inc is directed to E-File the Civil Case Filing Fee (found under Other Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day. Once the filing fee event is completed the initiating document (Motion to Compel and cover sheet ) may be E-filed.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris Research, Inc. et al v. Knobloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nhance Inc
Represented By: Lewis M. Francis
Represented By: Elizabeth Mary Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Harris Research, Inc.
Represented By: Lewis M. Francis
Represented By: Elizabeth Mary Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin Knobloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?