Richins et al v. Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The
Plaintiff: Frank Richins and Allison Richins
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The
Case Number: 1:2018cv00170
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The. (Shakespear, Paul)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING ORAL ARGUMENT ON MOTION TO DISMISS- #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support .( Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2019 at 03:30 PM in Rm 8.100 before Judge Clark Waddoups.) Defendant has up to and through February 15, 2019 to file its reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss. See Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 1/16/19. (jmr)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DOCKET TEXT ORDER finding as moot #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 1/16/2019. No attached document. (tcs)
January 16, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support: Motion Hearing re-set for 3/14/2019 at 03:30 PM in Rm 8.100 before Judge Clark Waddoups. (tcs)
January 15, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION re 8 Notice of Hearing on Motion by Allison Richins, Frank Richins. (Dunn, James)
January 11, 2019 Filing 9 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dimiss filed by Defendant Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shakespear, Paul)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support : Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2019 at 03:00 PM in Rm 8.100 before Judge Clark Waddoups. (tcs)
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Allison Richins, Frank Richins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deed of Trust, #2 Exhibit Assignment of Deed of Trust, #3 Exhibit Notice of Default, #4 Exhibit Appointment or Substitution of Trustee)(Dunn, James)
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 ERRATA to #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - the Note)(Shakespear, Paul)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 File Received from Second District Court-Farmington (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 NEF, #3 Lis Pendens, #4 NEF, #5 Summons on Return, #6 NEF, #7 Notice of Appearance, #8 NEF, #9 Notice of Removal, #10 NEF) (jmr)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The, and Plaintiffs Allison Richins and Frank Richins. (tlh)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The. (Shakespear, Paul)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Second District Court, Davis County, case number 18070113, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3170430) filed by Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Complaint) Assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups (Shakespear, Paul)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups. Defendant Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richins et al v. Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Richins
Represented By: James T. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Richins
Represented By: James T. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The
Represented By: Paul W. Shakespear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?