Csuha v. Best Friends Animal Society
Plaintiff: Dora Csuha
Defendant: Best Friends Animal Society
Case Number: 1:2019cv00001
Filed: January 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dale A Kimball
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
2 Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Subpoena by Dora Csuha (Egan, Austin)
March 26, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Best Friends Animal Society of Defendant's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Larsen, Erika)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 2/28/2019. (eat)
February 27, 2019 Filing 14 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to the case. (las)
February 27, 2019 Filing 13 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Best Friends Animal Society. (las)
February 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #8 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (las)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/9/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 8/9/2019. Fact Discovery 9/9/2019. Expert Discovery due by 12/1/2019. Motions due by 1/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 2/21/2019. (las)
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Egan, Austin)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Dora Csuha. (las)
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Best Friends Animal Society, Plaintiff Dora Csuha. Form due by 2/21/2019. (las)
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Best Friends Animal Society, Plaintiff Dora Csuha. (las)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ruth A. Shapiro on behalf of Best Friends Animal Society (Shapiro, Ruth)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Best Friends Animal Society. Attorney Erika M. Larsen added to party Best Friends Animal Society(pty:dft)(Larsen, Erika)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 1/16/2019. (las)
January 2, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Best Friends Animal Society. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
January 2, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Best Friends Animal Society (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3173350) filed by Dora Csuha. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Egan, Austin)
January 2, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Plaintiff Dora Csuha is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Csuha v. Best Friends Animal Society
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dora Csuha
Represented By: Austin B. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Friends Animal Society
Represented By: Ruth A. Shapiro
Represented By: Erika M. Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?