Sierra RV v. Heartland Recreational Vehicles
Plaintiff: Sierra RV
Defendant: Heartland Recreational Vehicles
Case Number: 1:2019cv00014
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Heartland Recreational Vehicles identifying Thor Industries, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Harman, Stewart)
March 27, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff Sierra RV, Counter Defendant Sierra RV. (Ames, Chase)
March 20, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #5 Counterclaim filed by Sierra RV.(Ames, Chase)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 6/1/2019. Discovery due by 11/28/2019. Motions due by 12/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 3/13/2019. (las)
March 12, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Ames, Chase)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Defendant Heartland Recreational Vehicles, Plaintiff Sierra RV. (las)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Sierra RV. (las)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Heartland Recreational Vehicles. (las)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 File Received from Second District - Ogden, Weber County consisting of Docket and State Court Documents (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 Jury Demand, #3 Acceptance of Service, #4 Notice of Removal) (las)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 2/27/2019. (las)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 Heartland Recreational Vehicles ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Sierra RV filed by Heartland Recreational Vehicles.(Harman, Stewart)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Heartland Recreational Vehicles, Plaintiff Sierra RV. Form due by 3/14/2019. (tlh)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Heartland Recreational Vehicles and Plaintiff Sierra RV. (tlh)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3213204) filed by Heartland Recreational Vehicles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Harman, Stewart)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Defendant Heartland Recreational Vehicles is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sierra RV v. Heartland Recreational Vehicles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra RV
Represented By: David R. Nielson
Represented By: Chase Bennett Ames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heartland Recreational Vehicles
Represented By: Stewart B. Harman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?