Thomas E. Andrews et al v. Mitch R. Wade et al
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Andrews and Ruthellen Sheflin
Defendant: Peach Canyon Farm LLC, Mitch R. Wade and Freston Wade FamilyLLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00015
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dale A Kimball
Referring Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #23 Motion to Dismiss. This action is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Case Closed. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 10/7/2019. (eat)
October 3, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Mitch R. Wade, Peach Canyon Farm LLC, and Freston Wade Family LLC. (Ferrara, Tajha) Modified by adding all Defendants as filers on 10/7/2019 (eat).
September 19, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Thomas E. Andrews. Motions referred to Paul M. Warner.(kpf)
August 16, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Stay, #20 MOTION to Stay filed by Defendants Mitch R. Wade, Peach Canyon Farm LLC, and Freston Wade Family LLC. (Ferrara, Tajha) Modified by adding all filers on 8/16/2019 (eat).
August 12, 2019 Filing 21 SECOND MOTION to Stay Case for 90 Days, filed by Plaintiff Thomas E. Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motions referred to Paul M. Warner. (eat) Modified by correcting filing date on 8/14/2019 (eat).
August 5, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Stay filed by Plaintiff Thomas E. Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motions referred to Paul M. Warner. (eat)
July 2, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: Service of Summons on Defendant Mitch R. Wade (No copy of summons attached) filed by Thomas E. Andrews. (kpf)
June 26, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Trystan B. Smith on behalf of Freston Wade FamilyLLC, Peach Canyon Farm LLC, Mitch R. Wade (Smith, Trystan)
June 26, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Freston Wade FamilyLLC, Peach Canyon Farm LLC, Mitch R. Wade.(Ferrara, Tajha)
June 26, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Tajha L. Ferrara on behalf of Freston Wade FamilyLLC, Peach Canyon Farm LLC (Ferrara, Tajha)
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Tajha L. Ferrara on behalf of Mitch R. Wade (Ferrara, Tajha)
May 13, 2019 Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Peach Canyon Farm LLC. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
May 13, 2019 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Freston Wade FamilyLLC. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
May 13, 2019 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Mitch R. Wade. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
April 25, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST for to issue summons filed by Plaintiff Thomas E. Andrews. (kpf)
April 25, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Freston Wade FamilyLLC, Peach Canyon Farm LLC, Mitch R. Wade. filed by Thomas E. Andrews, Ruthellen Sheflin (not signed). (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kpf)
April 25, 2019 Full Filing fee: $ 400.00 received, receipt number 4681086066. (nl)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: TBD. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this order to file with the Court a certified copy of his inmate trust account statements. If Plaintiff does not fully comply, this complaint will be dismissed. Collection of Fees Sent: No. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 4/4/2019. (eat)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Paul M. Warner. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 3/4/2019. (eat)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from USDC of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-00967. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball.
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF UTAH by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of this Court shall transfer this matter from this Court to the United States District Court for the District of Utah. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Thomas E. Andrews. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.] Modified by unterming the motion on 3/1/2019 (rks).
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1-10, Freston Wade FamilyLLC, Peach Canyon Farm LLC, Roes 11-21, inclusive, Mitch R. Wade.Case assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver, filed by plaintiffs Thomas E. Andrews, Ruthellen Sheflin. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE RE: DISCREPANCIES WITH LODGING OF COMPLAINT mailed to plaintiffs Thomas E. Andrews, Ruthellen Sheflin. Upon submission of your complaint it was noted that you did not pay the appropriate filing fee. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you must sign and complete the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support form (CV-60P) attached. If you do not respond within THIRTY DAYS from the date below, your action will be dismissed and the file closed. If you submit the CV-60P form or pay the filing fee within THIRTY DAYS, your case will be filed. You may return your fee waiver and/or payment to any of the Courthouses listed on this notice. Re Lodged Complaint (esa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/8/2019: #1 lodged complaint) (esa). [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
February 8, 2019 LODGED COMPLAINT: Complaint sought to be filed by Plaintiffs Thomas E. Andrews, Ruthellen Sheflin. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas E. Andrews et al v. Mitch R. Wade et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peach Canyon Farm LLC
Represented By: Trystan B. Smith
Represented By: Tajha L. Ferrara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitch R. Wade
Represented By: Trystan B. Smith
Represented By: Tajha L. Ferrara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freston Wade FamilyLLC
Represented By: Trystan B. Smith
Represented By: Tajha L. Ferrara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruthellen Sheflin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?