Nalder et al v. Biomet, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jason Nalder and Tammie A Nalder
Defendant: Biomet US Reconstruction, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet Manufacturing Corp and Biomet Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv00016
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Bruce S Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 72 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING: Status Conference is re-set for 6/6/2019 at 01:15 PM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. (kms)
April 19, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE OF HEARING: (Notice generated by clerks office) Status Conference reset for 4/29/2019 at 10:00 AM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. (las)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #69 Motion to Continue Status Conference. The Court hereby continues the status conference presently scheduled for April 22, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. to April 29, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 4/19/2019. (las)
April 19, 2019 Filing 69 Joint MOTION to Continue Status Conference (Joint Motion and Stipulation To Continue Status Conference For One Week) filed by Plaintiffs Jason Nalder, Tammie A Nalder. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cannon, Douglas)
April 5, 2019 Filing 68 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins: Status Conference held on 4/5/2019. Status Conference set for 4/22/2019 at 10:00 AM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. Attorney for Plaintiff: Douglas B. Cannon, Attorney for Defendant: Blake M. Biddulph, Theodore E. O'Reilly - via telephone. Court Reporter: Lyndsay Payeur.(kpf) Modified on to add text and image 4/24/2019 (kpf).
March 29, 2019 Filing 67 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Biddulph, Blake)
March 13, 2019 Filing 66 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendants Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction identifying Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Biddulph, Blake)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #62 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Theodore E. O'Reilly for Biomet Inc,Theodore E. O'Reilly for Biomet Manufacturing Corp,Theodore E. O'Reilly for Biomet Orthopedics LLC,Theodore E. O'Reilly for Biomet US Reconstruction. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 3/13/2019. (las)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #63 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Llonyddwch Rhyddid Watkins for Biomet Inc,Llonyddwch Rhyddid Watkins for Biomet Manufacturing Corp,Llonyddwch Rhyddid Watkins for Biomet Orthopedics LLC,Llonyddwch Rhyddid Watkins for Biomet US Reconstruction. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 3/6/2019. (las)
March 12, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Llonyddwch Rhyddid Watkins , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3224753, filed by Defendants Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Llonyddwch Rhyddid Watkins, #2 Text of Proposed Order )(Biddulph, Blake)
March 12, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Theodore E. O'Reilly , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3224745, filed by Defendants Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Theodore E. O'Reilly, #2 Text of Proposed Order )(Biddulph, Blake)
March 12, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake M. Biddulph on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction (Biddulph, Blake)
March 12, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Rick L. Rose on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction (Rose, Rick)
March 6, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE OF HEARING: Status Conference (and scheduling conference, if appropriate) set for 4/5/2019 at 11:00 AM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. (kms)
March 5, 2019 Filing 57 After review of the case, case reassigned to District Judge per 56 Docket Text Order. Case randomly assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse no longer assigned to the case. (las)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. The procedural posture of the case, addressed in the #52 Group 3 Transfer Order and Explanation to Receiving Courts, warrants reassignment of this case to district judge. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be reassigned to a district judge through random reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 3/5/2019. (nas)
March 4, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Erin Linder Hanig, John D. LaDue, for Defendants Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction (rks)
March 4, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Adrienne Franco Busby, Andrew L. Campbell, J. Joseph Tanner, Stephanie N. Russo, for Defendants Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction (rks)
March 4, 2019 Filing 53 Case transferred in from USDC of Indiana Northern; Case Number 3:17-cv-00367. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse.
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 GROUP 3 TRANSFER ORDER AND EXPLANATION TO RECEIVING COURTS Pursuant to the court's prior orders and 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), this case is TRANSFERRED to the District of Utah, Northern Division. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/22/19. (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR JANUARY 9, 2019 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for March 4, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (EST). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/10/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 50 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/9/2019 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Navan Ward. Dft appeared by atty Erin Hanig, John Winter. Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for March 4, 2019 at 01:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) Modified on 1/11/2019 to correct date hearing held (jld). Modified on 2/1/2019 to correct date hearing held (dk). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on January 9, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/7/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 48 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/15/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer. Dft appeared by atty John Winter, Erin Hanig. Topics discussed included status of discovery in Groups 6 and 7 and pending motions. Next status conference set for Wednesday, January 9, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) Modified on 12/13/2018 to correct date of hearing (jld). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Concerning Remote Attendance at Status Conference; set for 11/15/2018 01:15 PM EST by telephone can join via conference call. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/9/2018. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(lpw) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER The court GRANTS the parties' joint motion for an extension of time to submit the proposed Remand Group 2 case list (Doc. No. 3723 ) to/including 10/5/2018. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/1/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER By agreement of the parties, the November 8 status conference is RESET for Thursday 11/15/2018 at 1:15 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/24/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR SEPTEMBER 19, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for November 8, 2018 at 1:15 p.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/21/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER The court GRANTS the defendants' 3178 Motion to add Attorneys J. Joseph Tanner, Adrienne Franco Busby, Andrew L. Campbell, and Stephanie N. Russo as Co-Liaison Counsel. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/19/2018. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Filing 38 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/19/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty N. Ward and B. Fulmer (by phone). Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. Winter, J. LaDue, J. Tanner (in person). The Court hears from parties. Written order to follow. The next Status Conference is set for 11/8/2018 at 1:15 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Adrienne Franco Busby on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC. (ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie N Russo on behalf of Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet, Inc.(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L Campbell on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC. (ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by J Joseph Tanner on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC. (ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on September 19, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/12/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER OF TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) AND EXPLANATION TO RECEIVING COURTS Pursuant to the court's prior orders and 28 USC 1404(a), the Clerk of Court is ORDERED TO TRANSFER the cases listed on Exhibit A to the venues agreed upon by the parties and designated in the order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/6/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 35 SUGGESTION OF REMAND/EXPLANATION TO TRANSFEROR COURTS Pursuant to 28 USC 1407(a) and Panel Rule 10.1(b), the court suggests that the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation remand the cases listed in Exhibit A to the districts from which they were transferred. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/6/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (A copy of this Order was emailed to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 9/6/2018) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER VACATING DIRECT FILING PROVISION AND REQUESTING CESSATION OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFERS : Pursuant to the scheduling order issued on 4/23/18 Doc No. 3573 , the provisions in Section III of the 2/15/13 and 3/14/16 Case Mgmt Orders Doc. Nos. 242 and 3096 allowing direct filing in this Court are VACATED effective 9/1/18, and no direct filings will be allowed after that date. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/24/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: The parties shall have to and including 8/31/18 to file any objections they may have to: (1) adding 3:13-CV-283, 3:13-CV-1017, 3:14-CV-1264, and 3:14-CV-1271 to the list of cases to be included in Remand Group 1, and (2) transferring all direct-filings to the jurisdictions identified in the proposed list and issuing a suggestion of remand in the cases listed above . Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/16/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER The Defendants' ( 3623 in 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG) Consent MOTION to reset Status Conference is GRANTED. The Status Conference is RESET 9/19/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/26/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 31 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 7/18/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty A. Davis, N. Ward. Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. LaDue, J. Winter. Topics discussed included status of Group 5 and 6 discovery, the proposed pretrial order on remand, upcoming expert video depositions, pro se cases and pending motions. Following discussion, the court directed plaintiff's counsel to file any motion to enforce settlement in Simpson v. Biomet, 3:16cv466, by Aug 9, 2018. Next status conference set for Aug 27, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT) before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Remote Attendance Order for July 18, 2018 Status Conference Call in information for the hearing on 7/18/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/12/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
June 12, 2018 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Nalder, Tammie A Nalder to Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Cannon PHV, Douglas) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 28 Docket Annotation: The Dismissal Order entered on 5/29/2018 related to only three member cases, but was inadvertently docketed in all pending member cases. To avoid confusion and correct the error, the original entry [Doc. No. 3593 ] was deleted from the master and all member case dockets, and the order was redocketed in 3:12md2391 [Doc. No. 3596 ] and the related member cases (3:13cv1243, 3:14cv1243, and 3:16cv170).Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 27 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/17/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer. Dft appeared by atty John Winter and John LaDue. The Court hears from parties. A Status Conference is set for 7/18/2018 at 1:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter J. Hoffman.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the May 17, 2018 status conference.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/9/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER - This order activates Group 6 (Exh. A) for case specific discovery purposes and establishes deadlines for winding up the MDL proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/23/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING 3560 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Parties given to and including April 11, 2018 to file the joint proposed scheduling order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/10/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER By agreement of the parties, the court established deadlines and a schedule for briefing summary judgment motions in the cases identified in Exhibits A, B, and C to this order. See order for details.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/29/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING IN PART Plaintiffs Steering Committee's request to take video depositions of its generic expert witnesses, and DIRECTING parties to submit proposed agreed scheduling order by April 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/26/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR MARCH 12, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for Thursday, May 17, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. (EDT).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/14/2018. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
March 12, 2018 Filing 20 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/12/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by attys Jasper Ward (in person), Brenda Fulmer and Ahmad Diab (by phone). Dft appeared by attys Erin Hanig, John LaDue, and John Winter (all in person). The Court hears from parties. Status Conference set for 5/17/2018 at 1:00 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written order to follow.(Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 OPINION AND ORDER Biomets 3388 motions for summary judgment related to the Taper, ReCap, and metal-on-polyethylene devices is DENIED on the merits; Biomets 3390 motions for summary judgment relating to the state-of-the-art defense is DENIED, without prejudice; If the plaintiffs in White v. Biomet (3:16cv115) and Glynn v. Biomet (3:15cv491) wish to take device-specific expert depositions, they should file a motion to that effect within 14 days from the date of this order, and should indicate in that motion whether local counsel will conduct the deposition, with or without the assistance of the Plaintiffs Steering Committee. The plaintiffs in the Price v. Biomet (3:14cv275) and Gearon v. Biomet (3:14cv2099) shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file a motion to amend the scheduling order to allow device-specific expert depositions or, alternatively, a motion for suggestion of remand. If they elect the later, the Plaintiffs Steering Committee should address the effect, if any, remand would have on the plaintiffs obligations under the December 7,2015 Amended Holdback Order 3022 in its response. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/8/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR JANUARY 30, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of the topics discussed and actions taken. The next Status Conference is set for 3/12/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT)in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/1/18. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
January 30, 2018 Filing 17 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/30/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer (in person), Ahmed Diab and Justin Presnal (by phone). Dft appeared by atty Erin Linder and John LaDue (in person), John Winter (by phone). The next Status Conference is set for 3/12/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written order to follow.(Court Reporter Debra Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Remote Attendance Order for January 30, 2018 Telephonic Status Conference Call-in information for the telephonic status conference on January 30, 2018 at 1:30 pm (EDT).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/25/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
December 21, 2017 Filing 15 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 3381 Executive Committee's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet's expert Steven R. Schmid; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 3382 the Executive Committee's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet expert David Schroeder; DENYING 3383 the Executive Committee's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet's expert Daniel Schultz, M.D.; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 3384 the Executive Committee's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet's expert Andrew I Spitzer, M.D.; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 3385 the Executive Committee's Motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet's expert Dr. Kenneth St. John; DENYING 3386 Biomet's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of the plaintiffs' expert Mari Truman; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 3399 Biomet's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of the plaintiffs' expert George S Kantor, M.D. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER On the court's own motion and without objection, the telephonic status conference originally set for 12/19/2017 is now RESET for Tuesday, 1/30/2018 at 1:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/18/17. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the 12/19/2017 status conference at 1:30 pm (EST). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/12/17. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
October 26, 2017 Filing 12 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 10/26/2017 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty B. Fulmer. Dft appeared by atty J. LaDue. The Court hears from the parties. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/19/2017 at 1:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the Oct. 26, 2017 status conference at 1:30 pm (EDT).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/23/17. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR AUGUST 24, 2017 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. The next status conference is set for Thursday, October 26, 2017 at 1:30 PM (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/28/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE : Call-in information for the August 24, 2017 status conference at 1:00 pm (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/18/2017. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR JULY 13, 2017 STATUS CONFERENCE , Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Parties to submit recommendations regarding procedures for handling new referrals and culminating proceedings by August 17, 2017. Next status conference set for August 24, 2017 at 1:00 p.m. (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/14/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
July 14, 2017 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Biomet Manufacturing Corp., Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc..(Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the July 13, 2017 status conference at 9:30 am (EDT).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/10/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING ( 3354 ) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG. The defendants shall have to and including 7/31/2017 to file any motion directed at the admissibility of Dr. Kantor's testimony under Federal Rule of Evidence 702. Response due by 8/31/17 and Reply to be filed by 9/11/2017. Signed by Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/15/17. (Copy mailed to pro se party)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
May 30, 2017 Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
May 26, 2017 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tammie A Nalder, Jason Nalder. All Defendants. (Cannon PHV, Douglas) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
May 17, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John D LaDue on behalf of Biomet Manufacturing Corp., Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc. (LaDue, John) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
May 17, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Linder Hanig on behalf of Biomet Manufacturing Corp., Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc. (Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
May 12, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3249345.), filed by Tammie A Nalder, Jason Nalder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Related Action)(Cannon PHV, Douglas) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nalder et al v. Biomet, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet US Reconstruction
Represented By: Llonyddwch Rhyddid Watkins
Represented By: Rick L. Rose
Represented By: Blake M. Biddulph
Represented By: Theodore E. O'Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Orthopedics LLC
Represented By: Llonyddwch Rhyddid Watkins
Represented By: Rick L. Rose
Represented By: Blake M. Biddulph
Represented By: Theodore E. O'Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Manufacturing Corp
Represented By: Llonyddwch Rhyddid Watkins
Represented By: Rick L. Rose
Represented By: Blake M. Biddulph
Represented By: Theodore E. O'Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Inc
Represented By: Llonyddwch Rhyddid Watkins
Represented By: Rick L. Rose
Represented By: Blake M. Biddulph
Represented By: Theodore E. O'Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Nalder
Represented By: Douglas B. Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammie A Nalder
Represented By: Douglas B. Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?