Blayden et al v. Andersen et al

Plaintiff: This Uptown Girl and Stefani Blayden
Defendant: Pamela Andersen, Randy Buchmiller, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Life Insurance Company and State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00017
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Referring Judge: Robert J Shelby
2 Judge: Brooke C Wells
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 DOCKET TEXT ORDER - Plaintiffs filed on March 4, 2019 a Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Motion), docket entry #3 . During a March 11, 2019 status conference, the court set the Motion for hearing on March 19, 2019, docket entry 23 . Prior to the evidentiary hearing, the parties filed a stipulated Motion for Miscellaneous Relief in which the parties requested the March 19 evidentiary hearing be vacated, docket entry #25 . The court granted the parties stipulated motion the same day, docket entry #26 . Since that time, Plaintiffs have taken no action with respect to their Motion. Owing to this fact, and the expediency with which temporary restraining orders need be resolved, the court DENIES Plaintiffs' Motion without prejudice, docket entry #3 . Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 5/2/2019. No attached document. (mjm)
April 3, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Joy Sarr on behalf of Pamela Andersen, Randy Buchmiller (Sarr, Joy)
April 3, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M. Durham on behalf of Pamela Andersen, Randy Buchmiller (Durham, Matthew)
March 29, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Stefani Blayden, This Uptown Girl, Defendants State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Life Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (dla)
March 26, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan R. Houston on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Life Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Houston, Alan)
March 26, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul M. Belnap on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Life Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Belnap, Paul)
March 26, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Life Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Attorney Andrew D. Wright added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew D. Wright added to party State Farm Life Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew D. Wright added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft)(Wright, Andrew)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 3/22/2019. (mjm)
March 14, 2019 TRO Hearing set for 3/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Rm 8.200 before Judge Robert J. Shelby is VACATED. (mas)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion Stipulated Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. The hearing scheduled for March 19, 2019 is vacated. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 3/14/2019. (mas)
March 14, 2019 Filing 25 Stipulated MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Defendant Randy Buchmiller. (mas)
March 12, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support : (Notice generated by Mary Jane McNamee) Motion Hearing set for 3/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Rm 8.200 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. (mjm)
March 11, 2019 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert J. Shelby: Status Conference held on 3/11/2019. Counsel appear. The court sets the following deadlines: Defendant's response is due by 3/13/2019. Plaintiff's reply is due by 3/15/2019. An Evidentiary hearing on docket entry #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Stefani Blayden, This Uptown Girl is set for 3/19/2019 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 8.200 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. Any party who wishes to submit evidence in support of their affirmative arguments must submit affidavits or declarations that contain the direct testimony of the witness. Following the filing of the memo in opposition, counsel should meet and confer to determine which witnesses are essential for the hearing. The witnesses the parties deem essential shall appear for the hearing. We will then begin with cross examination of the relevant witnesses and hear argument by counsel. Attorney for Plaintiff: Jared Scott, Attorney for Defendant: Matt Durham. Court Reporter: Kelly Hicken.(mjm)
March 11, 2019 Filing 22 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Personal (Motion for TRO and Notice Rescheduling Hearing) served on State Farm Life Ins Co. on 03/11/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Stefani Blayden, This Uptown Girl. (Scott, Jared)
March 11, 2019 Filing 21 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Personal (Motion for TRO and Notice Rescheduling Hearing) served on State Farm Fire and Casualty Company on 03/11/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Stefani Blayden, This Uptown Girl. (Scott, Jared)
March 11, 2019 Filing 20 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Personal (Motion for TRO and Notice Rescheduling Hearing) served on State Farm Mutual Auto Ins Co. on 03/11/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Stefani Blayden, This Uptown Girl. (Scott, Jared)
March 11, 2019 Filing 19 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Personal (Motion for TRO and Notice Rescheduling Hearing) served on Pamela Andersen on 03/10/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Stefani Blayden, This Uptown Girl. (Scott, Jared)
March 8, 2019 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert J. Shelby: Status Conference held on 3/8/2019. Plaintiff served copies of complaint to all parties but the Motion for TRO did not go out to all parties at the time of the hearing. Defendant will notify and serve the TRO on all parties and the hearing will be continued to Monday, 3/11/2019. Status Report and Scheduling Conference reset for 3/11/2019 at 01:00 PM in Rm 3.100 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. Attorney for Plaintiff: Jared Scott, Attorney for Defendant: Matt Durham for Dft Randy Buchmiller. Court Reporter: Electronic/Kelly Hicken.(mas)
March 6, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF HEARING: (Notice generated by Mary Jane McNamee) Status Report and Scheduling Conference set for 3/8/2019 at 03:00 PM in Rm 3.100 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. (mjm)
March 6, 2019 Filing 16 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stefani Blayden, This Uptown Girl as to State Farm Life Insurance Company served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Scott, Jared)
March 6, 2019 Filing 15 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stefani Blayden, This Uptown Girl as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Scott, Jared)
March 6, 2019 Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stefani Blayden, This Uptown Girl as to State Farm Fire and Casualty Company served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Scott, Jared)
March 6, 2019 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stefani Blayden, This Uptown Girl as to Randy Buchmiller served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. (Scott, Jared)
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stefani Blayden, This Uptown Girl as to Pamela Andersen served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Scott, Jared)
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to State Farm Life Insurance Company. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Randy Buchmiller. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Pamela Andersen. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 Case reassigned per Docket # 5 Docket Text Order for Case to be Reassigned. Case randomly assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (jwt)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to court policy, Plaintiff's filing of a motion for immediate injunctive relief #3 renders this case ineligible for consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge. Accordingly, the court orders that this case be reassigned to a district judge through random reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 03/05/2019. (docket text order, no document attached).(amn)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Stefani Blayden in Support re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Stefani Blayden, This Uptown Girl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Confidentiality Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Cancellations)(Scott, Jared)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Stefani Blayden, This Uptown Girl. (Scott, Jared)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3217991) filed by Stefani Blayden, This Uptown Girl. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Scott, Jared)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiffs Stefani Blayden, This Uptown Girl is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blayden et al v. Andersen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Andersen
Represented By: Matthew M. Durham
Represented By: Joy Sarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Buchmiller
Represented By: Matthew M. Durham
Represented By: Joy Sarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul M. Belnap
Represented By: Alan R. Houston
Represented By: Andrew D. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul M. Belnap
Represented By: Alan R. Houston
Represented By: Andrew D. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Paul M. Belnap
Represented By: Alan R. Houston
Represented By: Andrew D. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: This Uptown Girl
Represented By: Jared D. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stefani Blayden
Represented By: Jared D. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?