ACI Construction v. USA
Plaintiff: ACI Construction
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00054
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2410
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for USA answer due 10/8/2019. Plaintiff shall have an additional sixty (60) days to propose a schedule to Defendant pursuant to paragraph 1 of the Courts Order to Propose Schedule, as previously modified (the Order) #3 and to meet and confer and file a joint Attorney Planning Meeting Report pursuant to paragraph 2 of the Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 7/31/2019. (nl)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, and Memorandum in Support and re Order to Propose Schedule filed by Plaintiff ACI Construction. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Black, Michael)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by ACI Construction. USA served on 6/10/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Black, Michael)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have up to sixty-seven (67) days after service of the Complaint to propose a schedule to Defendant pursuant to paragraph 1 of the Courts Order to Propose Schedule #3 and shall have up to eighty-one (81) days after service of the Complaint to meet and confer and file a joint Attorney Planning Meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 7/9/2019. (nl)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #8 Affidavit of Service. The document Filed incorrectly. The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile the pleading as Summons Returned Executed as to USA. The new pleading will receive a new document number on the docket. (nl)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 ENTERED IN ERROR AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Summons and Complaint served on United States of America Civil Process Clerk US Attorney, D Utah on June 10, 2019, filed by Plaintiff ACI Construction. (Black, Michael) Modified on 7/9/2019 stricken out filed under wrong event(nl).
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Extension of Time Order to Propose Schedule and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff ACI Construction. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Black, Michael)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Attorney General of the United States. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to United Stares Attorney, District of Utah. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to USA. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 06/04/2019. (kpf)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against USA (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3290292) filed by ACI Construction. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Notice of Federal Tax Lien) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Black, Michael)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff ACI Construction is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ACI Construction v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACI Construction
Represented By: Michael D. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?