Murdock v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Durk Murdock
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00055
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Robert J Shelby
Referring Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:0051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Durk Murdock, Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. (dla)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Gina Marie Rossi Obmaces on behalf of Union Pacific Railroad Company (Obmaces, Gina)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCKET TEXT ORDER TO COMPLY with paragraph 2(a) of #5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE. Within seven (7) days after the date of this order, the parties shall e-mail a stipulated Proposed Scheduling Order in word processing format to the court at utdecf_warner@utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 07/26/2019. (docket text order; no attached document) (jcd)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(LeBaron, L.)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company identifying Union Pacific Railroad Company as Corporate Parent. (Farrell, Thomas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. Attorney Thomas W. Farrell added to party Union Pacific Railroad Company(pty:dft)(Farrell, Thomas)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Durk Murdock (LeBaron, L.)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 6/28/19. (dla)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 6/27/2019. (mjm)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Durk Murdock as to Union Pacific Railroad Company served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (LeBaron, L.)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Union Pacific Railroad Company (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3294399) filed by Durk Murdock. Assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby (LeBaron, L.)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Plaintiff Durk Murdock is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murdock v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Thomas W. Farrell
Represented By: Gina Marie Rossi Obmaces
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Durk Murdock
Represented By: L. Miles LeBaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?