Kull v. International House of Pancakes et al
Plaintiff: Regina Kull
Defendant: International House of Pancakes, Robin Bronson, Peak Restaurant Partners and Peak Restaurant Group
Case Number: 1:2019cv00063
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Howard C Nielson
2 Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for More Definite Statement and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Peak Restaurant Group. Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(Weron, Kathleen)
August 15, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendants International House of Pancakes, LLC and Peak Restaurant Group, LLC and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants International House of Pancakes, Peak Restaurant Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of William Taylor)(Weron, Kathleen)
August 15, 2019 Filing 23 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint filed by Robin Bronson, International House of Pancakes, Peak Restaurant Group, Peak Restaurant Partners.(Weron, Kathleen)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Danielle S. Urban for Robin Bronson,Danielle S. Urban for International House of Pancakes,Danielle S. Urban for Peak Restaurant Group,Danielle S. Urban for Peak Restaurant Partners. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 8/9/2019. (las)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 8/8/2019. (las)
August 7, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Danielle S. Urban , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3343224, filed by Defendants Robin Bronson, International House of Pancakes, Peak Restaurant Group, Peak Restaurant Partners. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Application, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Weron, Kathleen)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying without prejudice #15 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on August 5, 2019. (mtw)
August 2, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Denise Weron on behalf of International House of Pancakes, Peak Restaurant Group, Peak Restaurant Partners (Weron, Kathleen)
August 2, 2019 Filing 17 Case Reassigned to District Judge per 16 Docket Text Order for Case to be Reassigned. Case randomly assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse no longer assigned to the case. (jwt)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED: Based upon the Plaintiff's filing of an #15 Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be reassigned to a district judge through random reassignment. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 8/2/2019. (nas)
August 1, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Regina Kull. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter and Response, #2 Exhibit Erased Webpages, #3 Sworn Declaration)(Bergman, Aaron)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for International House of Pancakes answer due 8/15/2019; Peak Restaurant Group answer due 8/15/2019; Peak Restaurant Partners answer due 8/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 7/31/2019. (nl)
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint (Second Unopposed) filed by Defendants Robin Bronson, International House of Pancakes, Peak Restaurant Group, Peak Restaurant Partners. Attorney Kathleen Denise Weron added to party Robin Bronson(pty:dft)(Weron, Kathleen)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for International House of Pancakes answer due 8/1/2019; Peak Restaurant Group answer due 8/1/2019; Peak Restaurant Partners answer due 8/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 7/19/2019. (las)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint (Unopposed) filed by Defendants International House of Pancakes, Peak Restaurant Group, Peak Restaurant Partners. Attorney Kathleen Denise Weron added to party International House of Pancakes(pty:dft), Attorney Kathleen Denise Weron added to party Peak Restaurant Group(pty:dft), Attorney Kathleen Denise Weron added to party Peak Restaurant Partners(pty:dft)(Weron, Kathleen)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regina Kull as to Peak Restaurant Group served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Bearnson, Bradley)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regina Kull as to International House of Pancakes served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Bearnson, Bradley)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regina Kull as to Peak Restaurant Partners served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Bearnson, Bradley)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Robin Bronson. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 6/27/2019. (las)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Peak Restaurant Partners. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Peak Restaurant Group. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to International House of Pancakes. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3310650) filed by Regina Kull. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Bearnson, Bradley)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Plaintiff Regina Kull is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kull v. International House of Pancakes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Kull
Represented By: Aaron K. Bergman
Represented By: Bradley H. Bearnson
Represented By: Wayne K. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International House of Pancakes
Represented By: Kathleen Denise Weron
Represented By: Danielle S. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Bronson
Represented By: Kathleen Denise Weron
Represented By: Danielle S. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peak Restaurant Partners
Represented By: Kathleen Denise Weron
Represented By: Danielle S. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peak Restaurant Group
Represented By: Kathleen Denise Weron
Represented By: Danielle S. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?