Roskelley et al v. Wal-Mart Stores
Plaintiff: Krystal Roskelley and Kirk Roskelley
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores
Case Number: 1:2019cv00065
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Referring Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Rice, Mitchel)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 8/16/2019. (las)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Reliance on Jury Demand by Kirk Roskelley, Krystal Roskelley re #5 Jury Demand (Gosdis, Shane)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr on 7/8/2019. (las)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 File Received from Second District- Ogden consisting of Docket and State Court Documents. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 Notice of Removal) (las)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores. (Rice, Mitchel)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Wal-Mart Stores.(Rice, Mitchel)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Kirk Roskelley, Krystal Roskelley, Defendant Wal-Mart Stores. (nl)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 2nd District Court Weber County, case number 190903230, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3312686) filed by Wal-Mart Stores. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Summons, Return of Service) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr (Rice, Mitchel)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Defendant Wal-Mart Stores is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roskelley et al v. Wal-Mart Stores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystal Roskelley
Represented By: Shane D. Gosdis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Roskelley
Represented By: Shane D. Gosdis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores
Represented By: Andrea M. Keysar
Represented By: Marianne Schumann
Represented By: Mitchel T. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?