Pure Maintenance Holdings v. Clark et al
Plaintiff: Pure Maintenance Holdings
Defendant: Adrenalin Enterprises, Jerel Clark, Viper Restoration and JD Clark Enterprises
Case Number: 1:2019cv00066
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
Referring Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0183
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Pure Maintenance Holdings filed by JD Clark Enterprises, Adrenalin Enterprises, Viper Restoration, Jerel Clark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(deJonge, Peter)
August 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Margaret Maness on behalf of Adrenalin Enterprises, Jerel Clark, JD Clark Enterprises, Viper Restoration (Maness, Catherine)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. deJonge on behalf of Adrenalin Enterprises, Jerel Clark, JD Clark Enterprises, Viper Restoration (deJonge, Peter)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Jerel Clark. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 7/3/19. (jmr)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 7/2/2019. (ncw)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Adrenalin Enterprises. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Viper Restoration. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to JD Clark Enterprises. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nl)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Adrenalin Enterprises, Jerel Clark, JD Clark Enterprises, Viper Restoration (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 26IG1123) filed by Pure Maintenance Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 US9238239, #2 Exhibit 2 US9517283, #3 Exhibit 3 INSTAPURE Trademark Registration, #4 Exhibit 4 Multnomah Licencse Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 Debt Release Agreement, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups (Harris, Kirk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups. Plaintiff Pure Maintenance Holdings is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pure Maintenance Holdings v. Clark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrenalin Enterprises
Represented By: Catherine Margaret Maness
Represented By: Peter M. deJonge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerel Clark
Represented By: Catherine Margaret Maness
Represented By: Peter M. deJonge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viper Restoration
Represented By: Catherine Margaret Maness
Represented By: Peter M. deJonge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JD Clark Enterprises
Represented By: Catherine Margaret Maness
Represented By: Peter M. deJonge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pure Maintenance Holdings
Represented By: Alexis Keiko Juergens
Represented By: Jared J. Braithwaite
Represented By: Kirk R. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?