Allen v. Sparks et al
Plaintiff: William Clyde Allen, III
Defendant: Hugh Hurwitz, Kelly Sparks, Christopher Wray and William Barr
Not Yet Classified: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 1:2019cv00071
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT TO COLLECTION OF FEES from Inmate Trust Account filed by William Clyde Allen, III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff William Clyde Allen, III. (kpf)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Service of Process (Prisoner). Summons to be served on: Kelly Sparks, High Witz, Christopher Wray and William Barr filed by Plaintiff William Clyde Allen, III. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(kpf)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by William Clyde Allen, III. (Originally received by the court on 07/08/2019). (Fee Status: IFP) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. (tlh)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: $44.23. If initial partial fee is not paid within 30 days, the case will be dismissed. Collection of Fees Sent: Yes Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 08/02/2019. (tlh)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for William Clyde Allen, III received from Correctional Institution (tlh)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia Romero for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 07/08/2019) filed by Plaintiff William Clyde Allen, III. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Sparks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh Hurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Clyde Allen, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?