Nelson v. Equifax Information Services
Plaintiff: Laura Nelson
Defendant: Equifax Information Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv00075
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Bruce S Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Equifax Information Services. (nl)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Laura Nelson. (nl)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Equifax Information Services, Plaintiff Laura Nelson. Form due by 9/11/2019. (nl)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Megan R. Garnett for Equifax Information Services. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 8/26/2019. (nl)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Megan Garnett , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3357280, filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pace, Adam)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam M. Pace on behalf of Equifax Information Services (Pace, Adam)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 7/17/2019. (las)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Equifax Information Services. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3325726) filed by Laura Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (McBride, Ryan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Plaintiff Laura Nelson is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Equifax Information Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services
Represented By: Megan R. Garnett
Represented By: Adam M. Pace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Nelson
Represented By: Theron D. Morrison
Represented By: Ryan L. McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?