Continental Western Insurance v. Salmon Electrical Contractors
Plaintiff: Continental Western Insurance
Defendant: Salmon Electrical Contractors
Case Number: 1:2019cv00087
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Continental Western Insurance as to Salmon Electrical Contractors served on 9/25/2019, answer due 10/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons)(Thompson, James)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Salmon Electrical Contractors. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark E. Mills for Continental Western Insurance. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 8/16/2019. (las)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark E. Mills , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3349979, filed by Plaintiff Continental Western Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission, #2 Exhibit Electronic Case Filing Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order of Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Thompson, James)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 8/7/2019. (nl)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Salmon Electrical Contractors (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3342318) filed by Continental Western Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Policy, #3 Exhibit Answer to Complaint) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Thompson, James)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Plaintiff Continental Western Insurance is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Continental Western Insurance v. Salmon Electrical Contractors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Continental Western Insurance
Represented By: James C. Thompson
Represented By: Mark E. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salmon Electrical Contractors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?