Western Watersheds Project v. Interior Board of Land Appeals et al
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project
Defendant: Department of the Interior and Interior Board of Land Appeals
Intervenor Defendant: State of Utah, State of Utah School and Institutional Trust Lands Administration and Utah Department of Agriculture and Food
Case Number: 1:2019cv00095
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Referring Judge: Ted Stewart
2 Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:0702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO INTERVENE -granting #12 Motion to Intervene; Motions terminated: #12 MOTION to Intervene filed by State of Utah, State of Utah School and Institutional Trust Lands Administration, Utah Department of Agriculture and Food. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 10/15/19. (jmr)
October 11, 2019 Filing 38 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD received from Interior Board of Land Appeals filed by Defendants Department of the Interior, Interior Board of Land Appeals. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Index, #2 Certification of Administrative Record)(Sawyer, Michael)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SCHEDULING ORDER: The administrative record shall be filed by October 13, 2019. Objections to the administrative record shall be filed by November 13, 2019. Plaintiff's Opening Brief due: February 10, 2020. Commissioner's Responsive Brief due: April 10, 2020. Plaintiffs Reply Brief (if any) due: June 1, 2020. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/8/2019. (las)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Paul M. Warner. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 9/20/19. (sjj)
September 18, 2019 Filing 35 Case randomly assigned to Judge Ted Stewart per docket text order 34 . Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT. Given the pending motion to intervene #12 , consent is not immediately feasible and it is HEREBY ORDERED that the case be reassigned to a District Court Judge through the random reassignment process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 09/17/2019.
September 13, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by Defendants Department of the Interior, Interior Board of Land Appeals. (Sawyer, Michael)
September 10, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Jake M. Garfield on behalf of State of Utah (Garfield, Jake)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Laurence J. Lucas for Western Watersheds Project. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/9/2019. (nl)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Megan Backsen for Western Watersheds Project. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/9/2019. (nl)
September 9, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Department of the Interior, Interior Board of Land Appeals, Intervenor Defendants State of Utah, State of Utah School and Institutional Trust Lands Administration, Utah Department of Agriculture and Food, Plaintiff Western Watersheds Project. Form due by 9/24/2019. (nl)
September 6, 2019 Filing 28 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Michael S. Sawyer replacing Rebecca J. Jaffe as counsel on behalf of Department of the Interior, Interior Board of Land Appeals. (Sawyer, Michael)
September 6, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Sawyer on behalf of Department of the Interior, Interior Board of Land Appeals (Sawyer, Michael)
September 6, 2019 Filing 26 First MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Laird Lucas , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3367471, filed by Plaintiff Western Watersheds Project. (Ban, Joel)
September 6, 2019 Filing 25 First MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Megan Backsen , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3367441, filed by Plaintiff Western Watersheds Project. (Ban, Joel)
September 6, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel M. Ban on behalf of Western Watersheds Project (Ban, Joel)
August 30, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Department of the Interior, Interior Board of Land Appeals.(Jaffe, Rebecca)
August 19, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney William Gerry Myers, III, for Intervenor Defendants State of Utah, State of Utah School and Institutional Trust Lands Administration, Utah Department of Agriculture and Food (rks)
August 19, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Laurence J. Lucas, Todd c. Tucci, for Plaintiff Western Watersheds Project (rks)
August 19, 2019 Filing 20 Case transferred in from USDC of Idaho; Case Number 1:19-cv-00037. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead.
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM ORDER AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, to transfer venue, (docket no. #6 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. It is granted to the extent it seeks to transfer venue to the Federal District Court for the District of Utah. It is denied to the extent it seeks to dismiss the case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that the Clerk shall take the steps necessary to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of Utah. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh) [Transferred from Idaho on 8/19/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Kathy A.F. Davis for State of Utah,Kathy A.F. Davis for State of Utah School and Institutional Trust Lands Administration,Kathy A.F. Davis for Utah Department of Agriculture and Food. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (dm) [Transferred from Idaho on 8/19/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Anthony Rampton for State of Utah,Anthony Rampton for State of Utah School and Institutional Trust Lands Administration,Anthony Rampton for Utah Department of Agriculture and Food. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (dm) [Transferred from Idaho on 8/19/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Intervene filed by State of Utah, State of Utah School and Institutional Trust Lands Administration, Utah Department of Agriculture and Food.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/22/2019.(Hunter, Alison) [Transferred from Idaho on 8/19/2019.]
July 5, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Intervene filed by Western Watersheds Project. Replies due by 7/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Service Information Sheet)(Backsen, Megan) [Transferred from Idaho on 8/19/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Kathy A.F. Davis. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1899687.)William Gerry Myers, III appearing for Intervenor Defendants State of Utah, State of Utah School and Institutional Trust Lands Administration, Utah Department of Agriculture and Food. Responses due by 7/5/2019 (Myers, William) [Transferred from Idaho on 8/19/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Anthony L. Rampton. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1899683.)William Gerry Myers, III appearing for Intervenor Defendants State of Utah, State of Utah School and Institutional Trust Lands Administration, Utah Department of Agriculture and Food. Responses due by 7/5/2019 (Myers, William) [Transferred from Idaho on 8/19/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Intervene William Gerry Myers, III appearing for Intervenor Defendants State of Utah, Utah Department of Agriculture and Food, State of Utah School and Institutional Trust Lands Administration. Responses due by 7/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Taylor Payne, #3 Exhibit B - Final Decision/FONSI, #4 [Proposed] Answer to Complaint)(Myers, William) [Transferred from Idaho on 8/19/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Western Watersheds Project Notice of Errata in Plaintiffs' Opposition Brief (Lucas, Laurence) [Transferred from Idaho on 8/19/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer filed by Department of the Interior, Interior Board of Land Appeals.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/20/2019.(Jaffe, Rebecca) [Transferred from Idaho on 8/19/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #6 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Replies due by 5/17/2019. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (dm) [Transferred from Idaho on 8/19/2019.]
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed Rebecca Jaffe appearing for Defendants Department of the Interior, Interior Board of Land Appeals. Responses due by 5/23/2019 (Jaffe, Rebecca) [Transferred from Idaho on 8/19/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer filed by Western Watersheds Project. Replies due by 5/13/2019.(Lucas, Laurence) [Transferred from Idaho on 8/19/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Rebecca Jaffe appearing for Defendants Department of the Interior, Interior Board of Land Appeals. Responses due by 4/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Decl. of Mellissa Rosenhan Wood)(Jaffe, Rebecca) [Transferred from Idaho on 8/19/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Marie Backsen on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Backsen, Megan) [Transferred from Idaho on 8/19/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Western Watersheds Project. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Return Receipts)(Lucas, Laurence) [Transferred from Idaho on 8/19/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Western Watersheds Project. (Lucas, Laurence) [Transferred from Idaho on 8/19/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Department of the Interior, Interior Board of Land Appeals, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jp) [Transferred from Idaho on 8/19/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1840531.), filed by Western Watersheds Project. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A IBLA Decision, #2 Exhibit Attachment B ALJ Decision, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Summons IBLA, #5 Summons DOI)(Lucas, Laurence) [Transferred from Idaho on 8/19/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Watersheds Project v. Interior Board of Land Appeals et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: State of Utah
Represented By: Kathy A. F. Davis
Represented By: Anthony L. Rampton
Represented By: Jake M. Garfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: State of Utah School and Institutional Trust Lands Administration
Represented By: Kathy A. F. Davis
Represented By: Anthony L. Rampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Utah Department of Agriculture and Food
Represented By: Kathy A. F. Davis
Represented By: Anthony L. Rampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project
Represented By: Megan M. Backsen
Represented By: Laurence J. Lucas
Represented By: Joel M. Ban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Interior
Represented By: Rebecca J. Jaffe
Represented By: Michael S. Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interior Board of Land Appeals
Represented By: Rebecca J. Jaffe
Represented By: Michael S. Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?