Sierra Homes Construction South v. Saunders et al
Plaintiff: Sierra Homes Construction South
Defendant: Brenda Saunders and Todd Saunders
Case Number: 1:2019cv00100
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 RECEIPT: remand order received by 1st Dist Court on 10/7/19 (alt)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL that case has been remanded to 1st District Court, Cache County. Notice and copy of order with docket sheet sent via US Mail (alt)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Claim for Relief; granting #7 Motion to Remand to State Court - CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 10/3/19 (alt)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Claim for Relief, MOTION to Remand to State Court Utah State Court filed by Counter Claimants Brenda Saunders, Todd Saunders, Defendants Brenda Saunders, Todd Saunders. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Donaldson, Peter)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Sierra Homes Construction South filed by Todd Saunders, Brenda Saunders.(Donaldson, Peter)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 File Downloaded from XChangeWEB for 1st District Court, Cache County, consisting of copies of docket sheet and documents filed in state court (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Summons Executed re B Saunders, #3 State Court Summons Executed re T Saunders, #4 State Court Ntc of Removal) (alt)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Brenda Saunders, Todd Saunders and Plaintiff Sierra Homes Construction South. (tlh)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from First Judicial District Court of Cache County, State of Utah, case number 190100277, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3361830) filed by Todd Saunders, Brenda Saunders. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet) Assigned to Judge Tena Campbell (Donaldson, Peter)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. Defendants Brenda Saunders and Todd Saunders are directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sierra Homes Construction South v. Saunders et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Homes Construction South
Represented By: Aaron K. Bergman
Represented By: Bradley H. Bearnson
Represented By: Wayman M. Stodart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Saunders
Represented By: Peter H. Donaldson
Represented By: Cole P. Crowther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Saunders
Represented By: Peter H. Donaldson
Represented By: Cole P. Crowther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?