Nicholas et al v. Nilson
Plaintiff: Raechal Nicholas and Jacob Nicholas
Defendant: Jazmyne Nilson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00125
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 16 Acknowledgment of RECEIPT re: Certified copy of the remand order. (nl)
November 12, 2019 Civil Case Terminated per docket text order 13 . Remanded to the state court. (nl)
November 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL that case has been remanded to 2nd District, Weber County via mail. Notice of Transmittal, Remand Order and Docket Sheet sent. (nl)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DOCKET TEXT ORDER. Motion to Remand to State #9 moot per Court Order at 13 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/12/2019. No attached document. (amn)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DOCKET TEXT ORDER. The parties' stipulated motion to remand the case to the state court, Second Judicial District Court, Weber County, State of Utah is GRANTED #12 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/12/2019. (docket text order, no document attached). (amn)
November 11, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATED MOTION Remanding Case to State Court by Jazmyne Nilson. (Smith, Trystan) Modified on 11/12/2019 to correct event.(nl).
November 7, 2019 Filing 11 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Jazmyne Nilson. (nl)
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #4 ) with Jury Demand filed by Jazmyne Nilson. (Ferrara, Tajha)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court Second District for Weber County, State of Utah and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Jacob Nicholas, Raechal Nicholas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Tucker, Alan)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within fourteen(14) days. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/28/2019. (nl)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Jacob Nicholas, Raechal Nicholas, Defendant Jazmyne Nilson. Form due by 11/12/2019. (nl)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Jacob Nicholas, Raechal Nicholas, Defendant Jazmyne Nilson. (nl)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 File Received from 2nd District, Weber County consisting of 190905432. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 State Return of Service J. Nilson, #3 State Notice of Filing Removal) (nl)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 2nd District Court Weber County, case number 190905432, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3403373) filed by Jazmyne Nilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Original Complaint and Summons) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Ferrara, Tajha)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 Modification of Docket: Error: Notice of Removal was filed as a Complaint by Defense Counsel. Correction: Complaint entry was struck and counsel has been notified to refile the event as a Notice of Removal. re #2 Complaint,. (tlh)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 **ENTRY ERROR** COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3403373) filed by Jazmyne Nilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Original Complaint & Summons) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Ferrara, Tajha) Modified on 10/25/2019 by striking text (tlh).
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Defendant Jazmyne Nilson is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nicholas et al v. Nilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raechal Nicholas
Represented By: Alan D. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Nicholas
Represented By: Alan D. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jazmyne Nilson
Represented By: Trystan B. Smith
Represented By: Tajha L. Ferrara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?