Wallis v. TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lauren Wallis
Defendant: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical USA and Coopersurgical, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00148
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Bruce S Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Filing 56 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins: Status Conference held on 2/4/2020. Detailed minute entry to follow pending Judge Jenkins' approval. Motion Hearing set for 3/16/2020 at 10:00 AM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. Attorney for Plaintiff: Nancy Mismash, Kara Hill by telephone, Attorney for Defendant: Tracy Fowler, Thomas McIntosh and Frederick Erny by telephone. Court Reporter: Lindsay Payeur.(Time Start: 1:29, Time End: 1:38, Room 7.200.)(las)
February 3, 2020 Filing 55 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Fowler, Tracy)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #52 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Frederick M. Erny for Coopersurgical, Inc.,Frederick M. Erny for Teva Women's Health, Inc.,Frederick M. Erny for The Cooper Companies, Inc.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 1/30/20. (jmr)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas G. McIntosh for Coopersurgical, Inc.,Thomas G. McIntosh for Teva Women's Health, Inc.,Thomas G. McIntosh for The Cooper Companies, Inc.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 1/30/20. (jmr)
January 29, 2020 Filing 52 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Frederick M. Erny , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3473960, filed by Defendants Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PHV Application Erny, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting PHV Motion)(Fowler, Tracy)
January 29, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas G. McIntosh , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3473939, filed by Defendants Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PHV Application McIntosh, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order re PHV Motion)(Fowler, Tracy)
January 24, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy H. Fowler on behalf of Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc. (Fowler, Tracy)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #48 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kara D. Hill for Lauren Wallis. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 1/21/20. (jmr)
January 17, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kara D. Hill , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3466703, filed by Plaintiff Lauren Wallis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Application, #2 Exhibit B -ECF Registration, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mismash, Nancy)
January 17, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy A. Mismash on behalf of Lauren Wallis (Mismash, Nancy)
January 3, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE OF HEARING: Status Report and Scheduling Conference set for 2/4/2020 at 01:20 PM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. PLEASE NOTE: The standard procedure before Judge Jenkins is to hold status and scheduling conferences in open court and on the record. (kms)
December 20, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Frederick M. Erny, for Defendants Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc. (rks)
December 20, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Gregory T. Sturges, for Defendants Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc. (rks)
December 20, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Brian Rubenstein, for Defendants Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc. (rks)
December 20, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Tobias Millrood, Kara D. Hill, for Plaintiff Lauren Wallis (rks)
December 20, 2019 Filing 40 Case transferred in from USDC of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-03990. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins.
November 18, 2019 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF OF THE DEFENDANTS TEVA WOMEN'S INC., COOPERSURGICAL, INC., AND THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. TO TRANSFER THIS ACTION UNDER 28 USC SEC. 1404 (A) TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF UTAH IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 11/18/19. 11/18/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
November 18, 2019 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 11/18/19. 11/18/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER THAT THE #31 MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS TO JOIN TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 11/18/19.11/18/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. AND TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC. ARE DISMISSED FROM THE ABOVE ACTION AS FRAUDULENTLY JOINED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 11/18/19. 11/18/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re #31 First MOTION for Joinder Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc Reply in Support of filed by LAUREN WALLIS. (HILL, KARA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 First MOTION for Joinder Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc filed by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(ERNY, FREDERICK) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 33 Memorandum Reply in Support re #20 MOTION to Transfer Venue in the Alternative Motion to Dismiss in the Alternative Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(ERNY, FREDERICK) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Transfer Venue in the Alternative Motion to Dismiss in the Alternative Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by LAUREN WALLIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex.)(HILL, KARA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 31 First MOTION for Joinder Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc filed by LAUREN WALLIS.Teva Pharmaceuticals USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex., #2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(HILL, KARA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER THE ORDER DATED SEPTEMBER 27, 2019 (DOC. #36 ) IS VACATED. PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLETE DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM DEFENDANT TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, INC. (TWH) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. ETC. PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE AND SERVE, ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 25, 2019, RESPONSIVE BRIEFS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(A). DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE AND SERVE ANY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTIONS TO TRANSFER VENUE ON OR BEFORE NOVEMBER 1, 2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 10/15/19. 10/16/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
September 27, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #20 MOTION to Transfer Venue in the Alternative Motion to Dismiss in the Alternative Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. RESPONSES DUE BY 10/25/2019. (fdc, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S #26 MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLETE DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM DEFENDANT TEVA WOMAN'S HEALTH, INC. IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE AND SERVE, ON OR BEFORE 10/25/19, RESPONSIVE BRIEFS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. &1404 (a); ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 9/27/19. 9/30/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED. (fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 28 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Complete Discovery Responses re #26 MOTION to Compel Complete Discovery Responses filed by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLETE DISCOVERY RESPONSES ON OR BEFORE 9/23/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 9/9/19. 9/10/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Compel Complete Discovery Responses filed by LAUREN WALLIS.Memorandum, Certificate of Good Faith, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Certificate of Good Faith, #3 Exhibit A Plaintiffs Initial Discovery Requests as to Venue, #4 Exhibit B Defendants Initial Discovery Response, #5 Exhibit C Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Deficient Responses, #6 Exhibit D Plaintiffs Joint Letter re: Meet & Confer, #7 Exhibit E Defendants First Supplemental Response to Discovery)(HILL, KARA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 25 Minute Entry for Conference not on the record held on 7/2/19, before Judge Bartle. (fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III. A CONFERENCE NOT ON THE RECORD was held on 7/1/19. (fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER THAT THE ORDER DATED 5/15/19 23 IS VACATED. DEFENDANTS SHALL RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' INTERROGATORIES RELATED TO THE MOTIONS OF DEFENDANTS TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 USC:1404(A) ON OR BEFORE JULY 12, 2019. PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE AN SERVE, ON OR BEFORE JULY 31, 2019, ANY RESPONSIVE BRIEFS IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTIONS OF DEFENDANTS TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 USC:1404(A). DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE AND SERVE, ON OR BEFORE AUGUST 12, 2019, ANY REPLY BRIEFS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTIONS TO TRANSFER VENUE. THE MOTIONS OF DEFENDANTS TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINTS OF PLAINTIFFS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION UNDER RULE 12(B)(2) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS UNDER RULE 12(C) FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ARE STAYED PENDING FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 7/1/19. 7/2/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL SERVE, ON OR BEFORE 5/29/19, INTERROGATORIES RELATED TO THE MOTIONS OF DEFENDANTS TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 USC SEC. 1404(A). DEFENDANTS SHALL RESPOND TO THE INTERROGATORIES ON OR BEFORE 6/28/19. PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE AND SERVE, ON OR BEFORE 7/12/19, ANY RESPONSIVE BRIEFS IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTIONS OF DEFENDANTS TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 USC SEC. 1404(A). DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE AND SERVE, ON OR BEFORE 7/22/19 ANY REPLY BRIEFS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTIONS TO TRANSFER VENUE. THE MOTIONS OF DEFENDANTS TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINTS OF PLAINTIFFS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION UNDER RULE 12(B)(2) OF THE FRCP AND FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS UNDER RULE 12(C) FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ARE STAYED PENDING FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 5/15/19. 5/17/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) (ORDER VACATED PURSUANT TO JUDGE BARTLE'S ORDER OF 7/2/19 #23 Modified 7/2/19 (fdc). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 21 Minute Entry for Status Conference held on 5/15/19, before Judge Bartle. (fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Transfer Venue in the Alternative Motion to Dismiss in the Alternative Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC..Memo, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/15/2019 02:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE III. (fdc, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE AND SERVE, ON OR BEFORE 5/13/19 AT 12:00 P.M., ANY MOTIONS UNDER 28 U.S.C. &1404 (a), RULE 12 (b)(2) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, AND RULE 12 (c) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. A STATUS CONFERENCE SHALL TAKE PLACE IN CHAMBERS ON 5/15/19 AT 2:00 P.M.; ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 4/22/19. 4/23/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED. (fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 18 Minute Entry for Status Conference not on the record was held on 4/22/19, before Judge Harvey Bartle, III. (ti, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/22/2019 10:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE III.(km, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by KARA D. HILL on behalf of LAUREN WALLIS with Certificate of Service(HILL, KARA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 15 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN RUBENSTEIN on behalf of COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 13 Remark THE STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/16/2018 IS CANCELLED. (km, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by FREDERICK M. ERNY on behalf of COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(ERNY, FREDERICK) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by TOBIAS MILLROOD on behalf of LAUREN WALLIS with Jury Demand and withdrawal of appearance of Derek T. Braslow, Esquire. (MILLROOD, TOBIAS) Modified on 10/15/2018 (lvj, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/16/2018 09:30 AM IN JUDGE BARTLE'S CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE III.(km, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER TO HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS, AS RELATED TO NICHOLLE BARCELO V. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., ET AL., C.A. NO. 18-CV-3984.. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 9/18/2018. 9/19/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Amendment to Notice of Removal to Attach Additional State Court Process, Pleadings and Orders (STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by COOPERSURGICAL, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC for COOPERSURGICAL, INC.; Corporate Parent TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES, LTD. for TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.; Corporate Parent TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LIMITED for TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.; Corporate Parent TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. for TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC.. by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC.(ahf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County, case number 180300601. Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 184812) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/20/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallis v. TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas G. McIntosh
Represented By: Frederick M. Erny
Represented By: Tracy H. Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas G. McIntosh
Represented By: Frederick M. Erny
Represented By: Tracy H. Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coopersurgical, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas G. McIntosh
Represented By: Frederick M. Erny
Represented By: Tracy H. Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Wallis
Represented By: Nancy A. Mismash
Represented By: Kara D. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?