Benton v. Equifax Information Services et al
Plaintiff: Steve Benton
Defendant: Equifax Information Services and Professional Credit Service
Case Number: 1:2020cv00019
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Nicholas M. Cassidy for Equifax Information Services.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/24/2020. (nl)
March 23, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas M. Cassidy , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3528433,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Application, #2 Exhibit B ECF Application, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Pace, Adam)
March 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam M. Pace on behalf of Equifax Information Services (Pace, Adam)
March 10, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Steve Benton as to Equifax Information Services Waiver sent on 2/25/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. (McBride, Ryan)
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Professional Credit Service. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Equifax Information Services. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within twenty-one (21) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 2/20/2020. (nl)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, Professional Credit Service (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3496205) filed by Steve Benton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (McBride, Ryan)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff Steve Benton is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benton v. Equifax Information Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services
Represented By: Nicholas M. Cassidy
Represented By: Adam M. Pace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professional Credit Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Benton
Represented By: Theron D. Morrison
Represented By: Ryan L. McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?