Eliason et al v. Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, The et al
Plaintiff: Brittnie L. Eliason, Veronique Eliason, Kylie M. Eliason and Brett L. Eliason
Defendant: Kirton McConkie, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, The, Dallin H. Oaks and Lee Wright
Case Number: 1:2020cv00024
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Overruling Objection and Adopting Report and Recommendation: Eliason's Objection is OVERRULED, and the Amended Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. This means Eliason may file a second amended complaint. If Eliason chooses to do so, the newly amended complaint must be filed within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Otherwise, the court will dismiss the case with prejudice and close the case. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 8/12/20. (dla)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RESTRICTING FILINGS BY PLAINTIFFS. Plaintiffs may file an opposition to the motions to dismiss that is appropriately titled. Additional motions, however, filed by Plaintiffs will not be entertained by the court. Plaintiff is prohibited from filing any further motions until the court rules on the pending motions to dismiss. Any additional motions will be lodged by the court on the docket as a filing, but will not be considered or docketed as a motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 5/26/20. (jwt)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDERdenying 18 Motion to Schedule Preliminary Injunction Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/30/2020. (jwt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eliason et al v. Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirton McConkie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallin H. Oaks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittnie L. Eliason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronique Eliason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kylie M. Eliason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett L. Eliason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?