Mazzetti v. Powell et al
Plaintiff: James Armond Mazzetti, III
Defendant: FNU Patton, FNU Coates, FNU Lambert, FNU Wrigley, FNU Powell and FNU Daniels
Not Classified By Court: Correction Section (FYI) and Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 1:2020cv00105
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Bruce S Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying #6 Motion for Service of Process (Prisoner). Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 09/10/2020. (kpf)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 Initial Prisoner Filing Fee: $ 52.00 received, receipt number 4681091407 (nl)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Service of Process (Prisoner). Summons to be served on: All defendants filed by Plaintiff James Armond Mazzetti, III. (jl)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff James Armond Mazzetti, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(jl)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Originally received by the court on 08/10/2020). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by James Armond Mazzetti, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #3 Envelope 1) Assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins (jl)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: $52. If initial partial fee is not paid within 30 days, the case will be dismissed. Collection of Fees Sent: Yes Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 8/14/2020. (jl)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for James Armond Mazzetti, III received from Correctional Institution (dw)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 08/10/2020) filed by Plaintiff James Armond Mazzetti, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Impencuiosity, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Impencuiosity, #3 Exhibit 3 - Proposed IFP Order)(dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mazzetti v. Powell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Coates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Wrigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Armond Mazzetti, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?