Haws v. Medical Priority Consultants
Plaintiff: Rosemary Haws
Defendant: Medical Priority Consultants doing business as Priority Dispatch and Priority Consultants doing business as Priority Dispatch
Case Number: 1:2020cv00109
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Referring Judge: Howard C Nielson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/27/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 11/27/2020. Discovery due by 8/6/2021. Motions due by 9/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 10/15/2020. (lnp)
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson-West, Michele)
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint, filed by Medical Priority Consultants, Priority Consultants. Attorney Michael P. O'Brien added to party Medical Priority Consultants(pty:dft), Attorney Michael P. O'Brien added to party Priority Consultants(pty:dft)(O'Brien, Michael)
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Rosemary Haws as to Medical Priority Consultants Waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Anderson-West, Michele)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 8/21/2020. (lnp)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 8/20/2020. (lnp)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Medical Priority Consultants. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Priority Consultants with Jury Demand. New Defendants: Medical Priority Consultants, Inc. dba Priority Dispatch Corp.. Removed Defendants: Priority Consultants, Inc. dba Priority Dispatch Corp.. filed by Rosemary Haws. (Anderson-West, Michele)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 STRICKEN - INCORRECT DOCUMENT ATTACHED AMENDED COMPLAINT against Priority Consultants with Jury Demand. New Defendants: Medical Priority Consultants, Inc. dba Priority Dispatch Corp.. Removed Defendants: Priority Consultants, Inc. dba Priority Dispatch Corp filed by Rosemary Haws. (Anderson-West, Michele) Modified on 8/19/2020 by striking the text. Wrong document attached. Amended complaint to be refiled. (lnp).
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Priority Consultants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3689093) filed by Rosemary Haws. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr (Anderson-West, Michele)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Plaintiff Rosemary Haws is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haws v. Medical Priority Consultants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Priority Consultants doing business as Priority Dispatch
Represented By: Michael P. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priority Consultants doing business as Priority Dispatch
Represented By: Michael P. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Haws
Represented By: Austin B. Egan
Represented By: Michele Anderson-West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?