Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance et al v. Walmart et al
Plaintiff: Token Bailey and Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance
Defendant: Razor USA, LG Chemical America and Walmart
Case Number: 1:2020cv00110
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of Mitchel T. Rice filed by Mitchel T. Rice on behalf of Walmart (Rice, Mitchel)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 9/14/20. (ss)
September 14, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance. (Siebers, Spencer)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CIVIL STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 9/14/20. (ss)
September 1, 2020 Filing 11 Defendant Walmart, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) with Jury Demand filed by Walmart. Attorney Kirk G. Gibbs added to party Walmart(pty:dft)(Gibbs, Kirk)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant LG Chemical America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of HyunSoo Kim)(Herrick, Carley)
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 Defendant Razor USA, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) with Jury Demand filed by Razor USA. (Gibbs, Kirk)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jonathan T. Barton for Razor USA.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 8/21/2020. (nl)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan T. Barton for Defendant Razor USA, Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3692525,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Razor USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission (Proposed))(Gibbs, Kirk)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 File Received from 2nd Dist, Weber County consisting of Docket report and other state court pleadings. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 State Notice of App re C. Herrick for LG Chem, #3 State Notice of App re J. Lund for LG Chem, #4 State Mtn for Ext To Respond, #5 State Req to Sub for Decision, #6 State Order granting Mtn for Ext, #7 State Notice of Removal) (nl)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants LG Chemical America, Walmart. (nl)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance, Token Bailey, Defendant Razor USA. (dw)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Razor USA identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Gibbs, Kirk)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Second District Court Weber County, case number 200904019, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3690423) filed by Razor USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit List to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Ex. A Plaintiffs' Complaint, #4 Exhibit Ex. B Service of Process Transmittal, #5 Exhibit Ex. Consents to Removal, #6 Exhibit Ex. D Notice of Removal to State Court) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (Gibbs, Kirk)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Defendant Razor USA is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance et al v. Walmart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Token Bailey
Represented By: Spencer C. Siebers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance
Represented By: Spencer C. Siebers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Razor USA
Represented By: Jonathan M. Burt
Represented By: Kirk G. Gibbs
Represented By: Jonathan T. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Chemical America
Represented By: John R. Lund
Represented By: Carley Leann Herrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart
Represented By: Kirk G. Gibbs
Represented By: Mitchel T. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?