Saxe v. Saul
Plaintiff: Sharon Saxe
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Not Classified By Court: SSA Notice
Case Number: 1:2020cv00111
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sharon Saxe. Andrew Saul served on 9/16/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rohlfing, Lawrence)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lawrence D. Rohlfing for Sharon Saxe.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 9/16/20. (alf)
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 First MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lawrence Rohlfing , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3717006,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Sharon Saxe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit cert of GS, #2 Exhibit app PHV)(Ban, Joel)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Andrew Saul. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to US Attorney. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Office of Attorney General. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul (Originally received by the court on 08/21/2020). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Sharon Saxe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (dw) Modified on 9/1/2020 to match date IFP Order was signed (dw).
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 08/31/2020. (dw)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 08/21/2020) filed by Plaintiff Sharon Saxe. (jl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saxe v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Saxe
Represented By: Joel M. Ban
Represented By: Lawrence D. Rohlfing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA Notice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?