CVB Inc v. Corsicana Mattress et al
Plaintiff: CVB Inc
Defendant: Leggett & Platt, Future Foam, Tempur Sealy International, Corsicana Mattress, Brooklyn Bedding, Elite Comfort Solutions, Serta Simmons Bedding and Fxi Holdings
Case Number: 1:2020cv00144
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Barlow
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support CORRECTED filed by Defendants Brooklyn Bedding, Corsicana Mattress, Elite Comfort Solutions, FXI Holdings, Future Foam, Leggett & Platt, Serta Simmons Bedding, Tempur Sealy International. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Malaysia, 85 Fed. Reg. 69,574, #2 Exhibit 2 - Vietnam, 85 Fed. Reg. 69,591, #3 Exhibit 3 - China, 84 Fed. Reg. 56,761, #4 Exhibit 4 - China - I&D Memo Final, #5 Exhibit 5 - China - I&D Memo Final, #6 Exhibit 6 - Vietnam - Initiation Checklist, #7 Exhibit 7 - China - Staff Report, #8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Toth, Justin)
December 11, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Brooklyn Bedding, Corsicana Mattress, Elite Comfort Solutions, FXI Holdings, Future Foam, Leggett & Platt, Serta Simmons Bedding, Tempur Sealy International. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Malaysia, 85 Fed. Reg. 69,574, #2 Exhibit 2- Vietnam, 85 Fed. Reg. 69,591, #3 Exhibit 3 - China, 84 Fed. Reg. 56,761, #4 Exhibit 4 - China - I&D Memo Final, #5 Exhibit 5 - China - Initiation Checklist, #6 Exhibit 6 - Vietnam - Initiation Checklist, #7 Exhibit 7 - China - Staff Report, #8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Toth, Justin)
December 11, 2020 Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Tempur Sealy International identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Toth, Justin)
December 11, 2020 Filing 33 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Serta Simmons Bedding identifying Dawn Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Toth, Justin)
December 11, 2020 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Leggett & Platt identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Toth, Justin)
December 11, 2020 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant FXI Holdings identifying Comfort Parent, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Toth, Justin)
December 11, 2020 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Elite Comfort Solutions identifying Leggett & Platt as Corporate Parent. (Toth, Justin)
December 11, 2020 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Future Foam identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Toth, Justin)
December 11, 2020 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Corsicana Mattress identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Toth, Justin)
December 11, 2020 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Brooklyn Bedding identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Toth, Justin)
December 11, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin T. Toth on behalf of Brooklyn Bedding, Corsicana Mattress, Elite Comfort Solutions, FXI Holdings, Future Foam, Leggett & Platt, Serta Simmons Bedding, Tempur Sealy International (Toth, Justin)
December 11, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by James S. Jardine on behalf of Brooklyn Bedding, Corsicana Mattress, Elite Comfort Solutions, FXI Holdings, Future Foam, Leggett & Platt, Serta Simmons Bedding, Tempur Sealy International (Jardine, James)
December 9, 2020 Filing 24 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by CVB Inc as to Future Foam served on 11/23/2020, answer due 12/14/2020. (Rudowitz, Andrew)
December 9, 2020 Filing 23 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by CVB Inc as to Tempur Sealy International served on 11/20/2020, answer due 12/11/2020. (Rudowitz, Andrew)
December 9, 2020 Filing 22 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by CVB Inc as to Brooklyn Bedding served on 12/8/2020, answer due 12/29/2020. (Rudowitz, Andrew)
December 9, 2020 Filing 21 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by CVB Inc as to Elite Comfort Solutions served on 11/20/2020, answer due 12/11/2020. (Rudowitz, Andrew)
December 9, 2020 Filing 20 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by CVB Inc as to Leggett & Platt served on 11/23/2020, answer due 12/14/2020. (Rudowitz, Andrew)
December 9, 2020 Filing 19 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by CVB Inc as to FXI Holdings served on 11/20/2020, answer due 12/11/2020. (Rudowitz, Andrew)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Andrew John Rudowitz for CVB Inc.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 11/20/2020. (kpf)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Sarah O'Laughlin Kulik for CVB Inc.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 11/20/2020. (kpf)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Sean P. McConnell for CVB Inc.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 11/20/2020. (kpf)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Wayne A. Mack for CVB Inc.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 11/20/2020. (kpf)
November 18, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew John Rudowitz , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3801493,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff CVB Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Steed, Jeffrey)
November 18, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sarah OLaughlin Kulik , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3801470,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff CVB Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Steed, Jeffrey)
November 18, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sean P. McConnell , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3801427,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff CVB Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Steed, Jeffrey)
November 18, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Wayne A. Mack , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3801370,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff CVB Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Steed, Jeffrey)
October 30, 2020 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Corsicana Mattress. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
October 30, 2020 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Brooklyn Bedding. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
October 30, 2020 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Elite Comfort Solutions. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Future Foam. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Serta Simmons Bedding. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Tempur Sealy International. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Leggett & Platt. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to FXI Holdings. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
October 28, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT CVB INC. against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3775879) filed by CVB Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet to Complaint Filing) Assigned to Judge David Barlow (Steed, Jeffrey)
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Barlow. Plaintiff CVB Inc is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CVB Inc v. Corsicana Mattress et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leggett & Platt
Represented By: Justin T. Toth
Represented By: James S. Jardine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Future Foam
Represented By: Justin T. Toth
Represented By: James S. Jardine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tempur Sealy International
Represented By: Justin T. Toth
Represented By: James S. Jardine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corsicana Mattress
Represented By: Justin T. Toth
Represented By: James S. Jardine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooklyn Bedding
Represented By: Justin T. Toth
Represented By: James S. Jardine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Comfort Solutions
Represented By: Justin T. Toth
Represented By: James S. Jardine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serta Simmons Bedding
Represented By: Justin T. Toth
Represented By: James S. Jardine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fxi Holdings
Represented By: Justin T. Toth
Represented By: James S. Jardine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CVB Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Steed
Represented By: Sarah O'Laughlin Kulik
Represented By: Andrew John Rudowitz
Represented By: Wayne Audrey Mack, Jr
Represented By: Sean P. McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?