Lawley v. USA
Petitioner: Dajuan Michele Lawley
Respondent: USA
Not Classified By Court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 1:2020cv00150
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Robert J Shelby
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING IFP APPLICATION - denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Petitioner's application to proceed without payment of the five-dollar filing fee is DENIED. Plaintiff has thirty days to remit five dollars to open this case. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 12/17/20. (jrj)
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Dajuan Michele Lawley received from Correctional Institution. (jwt)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that within thirty days Petitioner must file a certificate from the warden or other appropriate officer of the place of confinement showing the amount of money or securities that the petitioner has in any account in the institution Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 11/16/2020. (jl)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 11/05/2020). (dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawley v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: David F. Backman
Represented By: Melina Shiraldi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dajuan Michele Lawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?