Hall et al v. Weber County et al
Plaintiff: Nathan Hall and Hall, Matthew the Estate of
Defendant: Terry Thompson, Weber County, John Russell Wood, Mikel R. Kilfoyle, Wendy Jo Walkowiak and Nikki Leigh Nielsen
Case Number: 1:2020cv00158
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Referring Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Prison Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Undertaking of Bond by Nathan Hall, Hall, Matthew the Estate of (Richards, Randall)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time: The parties shall have up to and including January 25, 2021 to submit their Attorney Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 1/14/21. (dla)
January 13, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time Attorney Planning Meeting Report and Scheduling Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Nathan Hall. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Planning Meeting Email) Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(Swenson, Emily)
January 12, 2021 Filing 28 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by John Russell Wood.(Frankenburg, Kurt)
January 12, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt M. Frankenburg on behalf of John Russell Wood (Frankenburg, Kurt)
January 12, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory M. Soderberg on behalf of John Russell Wood (Soderberg, Gregory)
January 12, 2021 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Mikel R. Kilfoyle, Nikki Leigh Nielsen, Terry Thompson, Wendy Jo Walkowiak, Weber County. Attorney Frank D. Mylar added to party Terry Thompson(pty:dft), Attorney Frank D. Mylar added to party Weber County(pty:dft)(Mylar, Frank)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Defendants Wendy Walkowiak's Nikki Nielsen's and Mikel Kilfoyle's Motion for Extension of Time: Defendants Wendy Walkowiak, Nikki Nielsen and Mikel Kilfoyle have until January 11, 2021 to file their responsive pleadings to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 12/28/20. (dla)
December 23, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nathan Hall re #16 Order to Propose Schedule, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email 12/21/2020)(Swenson, Emily)
December 21, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, filed by Defendants Mikel R. Kilfoyle, Nikki Leigh Nielsen, Wendy Jo Walkowiak. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero. Attorney Frank D. Mylar added to party Mikel R. Kilfoyle(pty:dft), Attorney Frank D. Mylar added to party Nikki Leigh Nielsen(pty:dft), Attorney Frank D. Mylar added to party Wendy Jo Walkowiak(pty:dft)(Mylar, Frank)
December 8, 2020 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Nathan Hall (Attachments: #1 Copy of Summons)(Swenson, Emily)
December 8, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Nathan Hall (Attachments: #1 Copy of Summons)(Swenson, Emily)
December 7, 2020 Filing 19 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nathan Hall as to Wendy Jo Walkowiak served on 12/4/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Swenson, Emily)
December 7, 2020 Filing 18 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nathan Hall as to Nikki Leigh Nielsen served on 12/4/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Swenson, Emily)
December 7, 2020 Filing 17 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nathan Hall as to Mikel R. Kilfoyle served on 12/4/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Swenson, Emily)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 12/7/2020. (lnp)
December 4, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Nathan Hall as to Terry Thompson Waiver sent on 11/25/2020, answer due 1/25/2021; Weber County Waiver sent on 11/25/2020, answer due 1/25/2021. (Swenson, Emily)
December 4, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Nathan Hall as to John Russell Wood Waiver sent on 11/25/2020, answer due 1/25/2021. (Swenson, Emily)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 12/3/2020. (lnp)
December 2, 2020 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Amended Summons Issued Electronically as to Nikki Leigh Nielsen. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
December 2, 2020 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Amended Summons Issued Electronically as to Mikel R. Kilfoyle. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
December 2, 2020 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Amended Summons Issued Electronically as to Wendy Jo Walkowiak. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
November 25, 2020 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to John Russell Wood. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
November 25, 2020 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Nikki Leigh Nielsen. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
November 25, 2020 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Weber County. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
November 25, 2020 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Mikel R. Kilfoyle. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
November 25, 2020 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Wendy Jo Walkowiak. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
November 25, 2020 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Terry Thompson. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 Modification of Docket: Error: Complaint was filed againg the plaintiff instead of the defendants. Correction: Docket text has been modified to reflect complaint is filed against defendants rather than plaintiff; answer records corrected re #2 Complaint. (rks)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Nathan Hall Weber County, John Russell Wood, Mikel R. Kilfoyle, Terry Thompson, Wendy Jo Walkowiak (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3807327) filed by Nathan Hall. Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr (Swenson, Emily) Modified by correcting that the complaint was filed against defendants on 11/24/2020 (rks).
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Plaintiffs Nathan Hall and Hall, Matthew the Estate of are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall et al v. Weber County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Thompson
Represented By: Frank D. Mylar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weber County
Represented By: Frank D. Mylar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Russell Wood
Represented By: Kurt M. Frankenburg
Represented By: Gregory M. Soderberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikel R. Kilfoyle
Represented By: Frank D. Mylar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Jo Walkowiak
Represented By: Frank D. Mylar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikki Leigh Nielsen
Represented By: Frank D. Mylar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Hall
Represented By: Emily A. Swenson
Represented By: Randall W Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hall, Matthew the Estate of
Represented By: Emily A. Swenson
Represented By: Randall W Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?