Olson v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Paul L. Olson
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv00178
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Referring Judge: Tena Campbell
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Filing 17 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
January 15, 2021 Filing 16 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Paul L. Olson. (alf)
January 13, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Unum Life Insurance Company of America.(Hansen, Clint)
January 8, 2021 Filing 14 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (alf)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint,. Answer deadline updated for Unum Life Insurance Company of America to 1/19/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 1/6/21. (alf)
January 5, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Paul L. Olson, Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America. Form due by 1/20/2021. (alf)
January 5, 2021 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, filed by Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansen, Clint)
January 5, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Clint R. Hansen on behalf of Unum Life Insurance Company of America (Hansen, Clint)
January 5, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott M. Petersen on behalf of Unum Life Insurance Company of America (Petersen, Scott)
December 16, 2020 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul L. Olson as to Unum Life Insurance Company of America served on 12/15/2020, answer due 1/5/2021. (Reichardt, Andrew)
December 15, 2020 Filing 7 Modification of Docket: Error: Documents #5 and #6 erroneously filed in this case. Please disregard. Correction: They are stricken from the docket. (alf)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 12/15/20. (alf) Modified on 12/15/2020 - filed in wrong case. (alf).
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ADMINISTRATIVE APPEAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's Opening Brief due: 3/16/21. Commissioner's Responsive Brief due: 4/16/21. Plaintiffs Reply Brief (if any) due: 4/30/21. See order for specifics. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 12/15/20. (alf) Modified on 12/15/2020 - filed in wrong case. (alf).
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 12/15/20. (alf)
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Unum Life Insurance Company of America. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Unum Life Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-3832935) filed by Paul L. Olson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet ERISA Claim) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (Reichardt, Andrew)
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Plaintiff Paul L. Olson is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olson v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Clint R. Hansen
Represented By: Scott M. Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul L. Olson
Represented By: Andrew J. Reichardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?