Williams v. Biomet Orthopedics Inc et al
Plaintiff: Annette Williams
Defendant: Biomet Orthpedics Inc doing business as Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet Manufacturing Corp and Biomet Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv00011
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Barlow
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #106 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Mary E. Hershewe for Biomet Inc, for Biomet Manufacturing Corp, for Biomet Orthopedics LLC, and for Biomet US Reconstruction.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 03/22/2021. (jl)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #105 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Heather Carson Perkins for Biomet Inc, for Biomet Manufacturing Corp, for Biomet Orthopedics LLC, and for Biomet US Reconstruction.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 03/22/2021. (jl)
March 19, 2021 Filing 106 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mary E. Hershewe , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3957104,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendants Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet Orthpedics Inc, Biomet US Reconstruction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rose, Rick)
March 19, 2021 Filing 105 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Heather Carson Perkins , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3957088,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendants Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet Orthpedics Inc, Biomet US Reconstruction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) Attorney Rick L. Rose added to party Biomet Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Rick L. Rose added to party Biomet Manufacturing Corp(pty:dft), Attorney Rick L. Rose added to party Biomet Orthopedics LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Rick L. Rose added to party Biomet Orthpedics Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Rick L. Rose added to party Biomet US Reconstruction(pty:dft)(Rose, Rick)
January 26, 2021 Filing 104 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Teresa A. Griffin, for Defendants Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet Orthpedics Inc, Biomet US Reconstruction (rks)
January 26, 2021 Filing 103 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Adrienne Franco Busby, Andrew L. Campbell, J. Joseph Tanner, Stephanie N. Russo, for Defendants Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC (rks)
January 26, 2021 Filing 102 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Erin Linder Hanig and John D. LaDue, for Defendants Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet Orthpedics Inc, Biomet US Reconstruction (rks)
January 26, 2021 Filing 101 Remark - this case is an MDL remand of one of our cases that was transferred on 03/26/2018. Original case number 1:18cv28 BCW. (rks)
January 26, 2021 Filing 100 Case transferred in from USDC of Indiana Northern; Case Number 3:18-cv-00211. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge David B. Barlow.
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER transferring case to the District of Utah, case number1:18cv28. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by John W Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 1/21/21. (Attachments: #1 Suggestion of Remand and Explanation to Transferor Court)(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
January 19, 2021 Pursuant to the Order entered 1/11/2021, the 1/13/2021 Status Conference is VACATED at the request of the parties and is RESET as a video status conference on 3/23/2021 at 9:00 AM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
January 7, 2021 Filing 98 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND EXPLANATION TO TRANSFEROR COURT. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/7/2021. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG, 3:18-cv-00211-RLM-MGG (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
January 4, 2021 Filing 97 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN filed jointly by Annette Williams. (Summerill PHV, Peter) Modified text on 1/5/2021 (jld). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR NOVEMBER 19, 2020 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics addressed and action taken. Biomet's 3860 motion taken under advisement. Next telephonic status conference set for Wednesday, January 13, 2021, at 9:00 a.m. (E.S.T.) Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/25/2020. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(nae) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 95 RESPONSE to Motion re (3860 in 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG) MOTION for Sanctions based on Navan Ward's Violation of the Court's August 10, 2020 Order and 28 U.S.C. 1927 filed by Navan Ward, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email dated 10-9-20 re Meet & Confer confirmation of resolution of discovery issues in Hix, #2 Exhibit B - Email dated 1-10-20 re Parties's Discovery Sharing Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Hix Rule 26(f) Report, #4 Exhibit D - Hardison Notice of Filing GA 9-25-20, #5 Exhibit E - Hix Notice of Filing 9-25-20, #6 Exhibit F - Email dated re 9-23-20 Biomet requesting withdrawal of discovery, #7 Exhibit G - Email dated re 9-23-20 Biomet identifying common issue discovery, #8 Exhibit H - Email dated 10-8-20 re Plaintiffs' follow-up re parties' conferral call, #9 Exhibit I - Email dated 10-5-20 re Biomet's request for conference, #10 Exhibit J - Transcript of 10-6-20 Hearing re Hardison, #11 Exhibit K - Transcript of 3-6-20 Hearing re Hardison, #12 Exhibit L - Email dated 4-1-20 & Draft Joint Rule 26(f) Report)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(Ward PHV, Navan) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER This case is set for a telephonic status conference and hearing on Biomet's [Doc. No 3860 ] motion for sanctions on 11/19/2020 at 9:00 a.m. in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Any response to Biomet's motion should be filed by October 14 and any reply due by October 21, 2020. Parties are directed to confer and file a proposed schedule for disposition of all remaining issues by 11/6/2020 as set forth in the order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/6/20. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER (1) Biomets amended motion for protective order [Doc. No. 3846 ] is DENIED; (2) Biomet is GIVEN 14 days from the date of this order to comply with the March 12, 2020 order [Doc. No. 3833 ]; (3) Plaintiffs Lead Counsel, Navan Ward, is ORDERED to file a copy of this order and the March 12, 2020 order [Doc. No. 3833 ] in Hardison v. Biomet Inc., Case No. 5:19cv-69 (M.D. Ga.) and Hix v. Biomet, Inc., 3:18cv437-RCJ-WGC (D. Nv.), and to file a certificate of compliance in this court; and (4) The parties are ORDERED to submit their case management plans for the two remaining cases in Discovery Group 8B by August 28, 2020. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/10/20. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 3845 Motion for Protective Order in case 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/12/20. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) Modified on 5/13/2020 (jld). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to the amended motion for protective order [filed as DE 3847 in 3:12md2391]; Response to be filed by 5/18/2020. Text-only order by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/7/20. (jld) Modified on 5/12/2020 to clarify which document to be responded to (jld). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 90 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Biomet's Amended Motion for Protective Order (Unopposed) by Plaintiffs Plaintiffs' Executive Committee, Plaintiffs' Lead Co-Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(Ward PHV, Navan) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER By agreement of the parties, Sections I and IV of the December 7, 2015 Amended Holdback Order [Doc. NO. 3022 ] are amended by interlineation to address cases in which plaintiff's counsel has waived his or her attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/27/20. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER: In response to the recent outbreak of COVID-19, the courthouses in the Northern District of Indiana have been closed to the public until further notice. To limit the risk of spreading the virus, civil proceedings are being conducted by telephone or video-conferencing, if necessary, or continued to a date after May 1, 2020. See General Orders 2020-05 and 2020-06. When the courthouses reopen, the court will contact lead counsel and select a date and time for the next status conference. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/19/2020. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Memorandum regarding additional discovery and management of remaining cases. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/12/20. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 86 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/9/2020 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty B. Fulmer, N. Ward, M. Kranz, and B. Franciskato in person; J. Saunders, P. Shaw, T. Rockstad, and C. Shakib by phone. Dft appeared by atty J. Winter, E. Hanig, J. Tanner, and T. Griffin in person. The court hears from the parties. Written order to follow. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 85 RESPONSE by Brian S Franciskato to (3824 in 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG) Response/Reply,,,, . Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(Franciskato PHV, Brian) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on March 9, 2020 at 1:00 p.m. (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/5/20. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Teresa A Griffin on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc., Biomet Manufacturing, Inc., Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc., Biomet U.S. Reconstruction LLC, Biomet Orthopedics Inc, Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, John Cuckler, MD, Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Biomet Fair Lawn LLC, Biomet LLC, Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction LLC, Biomet, Inc, Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Zimmer Biomet Holdings Inc, Alabama Medical Consultants, Inc., Biomet US Reconstruction LLC, Zimmer US Inc, Biomet Manufacturing Inc, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction LLC Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(Griffin, Teresa) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER The March 9, 2020 scheduling conference is converted from a telephonic to an in person hearing. Biomet to file a list of all federal post-remand/transfer cases in which non-case-specific discovery has been allowed over Biomet's opposition and a list of any pending member cases that the court would have jurisdiction to try by February 28, 2020. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/7/20. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
January 29, 2020 Filing 81 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Annette Williams filed by Annette Williams. (Summerill PHV, Peter) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 80 NOTICE OF HEARING Telephonic Status Conference is RESET for 3/9/2020 at 1:00 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. This is a text only entry.Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER : On the court's own motion, the telephonic status conference on January 22, 2020 is VACATED and will be reset by separate order. Text-only order by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/21/2020. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the telephonic status conference on January 22, 2020 at 1:00 p.m. (EST). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/16/20. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 SHOW CAUSE ORDER The plaintiffs listed on Exhibit A shall have until 2/3/2020 to show cause, if any, why their individual case should not be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(b). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/14/20. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #56 Motion to Compel as set forth in the order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/15/19. (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
November 12, 2019 Filing 75 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/12/2019 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty B. Fulmer and A. Diab. Dft appeared by atty J. Winter and E. Hanig. The Court hears from parties. The next Telephonic Status Conference is set for 1/22/2020 at 1:00 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER CONCERNING NOVEMBER 12, 2019 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE : This matter is set for a telephonic status conference on November 12, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. (EST). The conference number is 720-903-7875, and the conference code is 3131-532#. Please call the line fifteen (15) minutes before the call begins, and identify everyone on the call to the operator. No recording of the status conferences is allowed. Attendees have no speaking parts unless authorized in advance by the court. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/8/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE: The November 12, 2019 status conference will be conducted by telephone. Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel to make arrangements for the call. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
September 24, 2019 NOTICE: On the court's own motion, Status Conference set for 10/7/19 is RESET to 11/12/2019 01:00 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 72 MOTION HEARING held on 8/22/2019 re #56 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Annette Williams before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared telephonically by atty P. Summerill. Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig. Arguments heard. For reasons stated, the court takes the matter under advisement. Written order to follow. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #67 Motion for Telephonic Hearing. The Telephonic Motion Hearing is set for 8/22/2019 at 11:30 AM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/15/19. (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 70 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/8/2019 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Navan Ward. Dft appeared by attys John Winter and Erin Hanig. Topics discussed included the status of discovery in Groups 8A and 8B, remand and transfer of Group 7 cases, and disposition of settled cases. Next status conference set for Monday, October 7, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 OPINION AND ORDER : Plaintiffs Executive Committees motion to modify future remand/transfer orders [Doc. No. 3767 ] is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/7/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on August 8, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/6/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION for Hearing re #57 Memorandum in Support, #56 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Plaintiff Annette Williams. (Summerill PHV, Peter) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 66 REPLY to Response to Motion re #56 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Annette Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summary Table Disco INT 2-5, 7-9, 12-18, 20-22; RFP 3-8, 12-14, 16, 22, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summary Table Disco INT 10, 11; RFP 20-24, 27-28, #3 Exhibit 3 - Sorensen Depo Ex. 1, pg 1 (redacted))(Summerill PHV, Peter) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #64 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Plaintiff's Reply to motion to compel to be filed by 7/29/2019.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/22/19. (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 64 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #63 Response to Motion, by Plaintiff Annette Williams. (Summerill PHV, Peter) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 63 RESPONSE to Motion re #56 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #61 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; The court GRANTS the agreed motion to extend the defendants' response deadline and AFFORDS the defendants to and including July 15, 2019, to submit their response to the Ms. Williams's motion to compel. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/9/19. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 61 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #56 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Defendants Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction LLC. (Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 AMENDED REMAND/TRANSFER SCHEDULE FOR DISCOVERY GROUPS 7 AND 8 This order sets forth the remand and/or transfer deadlines to applicable to Discovery Groups 7, 8A and B. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/2/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 REMAND/TRANSFER SHCEDULE FOR DISCOVERY GROUPS 7 AND 8 This order sets forth the remand and/or transfer deadlines applicable to Discovery Groups 7, 8A, and 8B. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/26/2019. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE for Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 6/24/19 Email)(Summerill PHV, Peter) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM in Support of #56 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Annette Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production to Defendants, #3 Exhibit C - 5/22/19 Email)(Summerill PHV, Peter) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Plaintiff Annette Williams. (Summerill PHV, Peter) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER : The status conference previously scheduled for July 18, 2019 is now RESET for Thursday, August 8, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. (E.D.T.) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/25/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR MAY 9, 2019 STATUS CONFERENCE : Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for July 18, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/9/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 53 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/9/2019 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty B. Fulmer. Dft appeared by attys E. Hanig, J. Winter. The court hears from the parties. Next Status Conference set for 7/18/2019 01:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written memorandum to follow. (Court Reporter T. Gallucci.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on May 9, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/7/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR MARCH 4, 2019 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for May 9, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/4/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 50 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/4/2019 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty B. Fulmer, N. Ward. Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. Winter. The Court hears from parties. The next Status Conference is set for 5/9/2019 at 1:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written memorandum to follow. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the Status Conference to be held on 3/4/2019 at 1:30 PM (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/27/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR JANUARY 9, 2019 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for March 4, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (EST). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/10/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 47 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/9/2019 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Navan Ward. Dft appeared by atty Erin Hanig, John Winter. Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for March 4, 2019 at 01:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) Modified on 1/11/2019 to correct date hearing held (jld). Modified on 2/1/2019 to correct date hearing held (dk). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on January 9, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/7/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 45 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/15/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer. Dft appeared by atty John Winter, Erin Hanig. Topics discussed included status of discovery in Groups 6 and 7 and pending motions. Next status conference set for Wednesday, January 9, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) Modified on 12/13/2018 to correct date of hearing (jld). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER ACTIVATING DISCOVERY GROUP 7 Identifies cases to be included in Group 7 for purposes of case-specific discovery and related deadlines. Completed and updated medical records authorizations to be provided to Biomet by 12/14/2018. Case-specific Discovery deadline is 7/12/2019. The parties are directed to confer and file a report within 90 days of the date of this order regarding management of all remaining cases. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11-14-18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Concerning Remote Attendance at Status Conference; set for 11/15/2018 01:15 PM EST by telephone can join via conference call. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/9/2018. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(lpw) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER The court GRANTS the parties' joint motion for an extension of time to submit the proposed Remand Group 2 case list (Doc. No. 3723 ) to/including 10/5/2018. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/1/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER By agreement of the parties, the November 8 status conference is RESET for Thursday 11/15/2018 at 1:15 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/24/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR SEPTEMBER 19, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for November 8, 2018 at 1:15 p.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/21/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER The court GRANTS the defendants' 3178 Motion to add Attorneys J. Joseph Tanner, Adrienne Franco Busby, Andrew L. Campbell, and Stephanie N. Russo as Co-Liaison Counsel. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/19/2018. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
September 19, 2018 Filing 34 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/19/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty N. Ward and B. Fulmer (by phone). Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. Winter, J. LaDue, J. Tanner (in person). The Court hears from parties. Written order to follow. The next Status Conference is set for 11/8/2018 at 1:15 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Adrienne Franco Busby on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC.(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie N Russo on behalf of Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet, Inc.(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L Campbell on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC. (ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by J Joseph Tanner on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC.(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on September 19, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/12/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER OF TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) AND EXPLANATION TO RECEIVING COURTS Pursuant to the court's prior orders and 28 USC 1404(a), the Clerk of Court is ORDERED TO TRANSFER the cases listed on Exhibit A to the venues agreed upon by the parties and designated in the order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/6/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 31 SUGGESTION OF REMAND/EXPLANATION TO TRANSFEROR COURTS Pursuant to 28 USC 1407(a) and Panel Rule 10.1(b), the court suggests that the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation remand the cases listed in Exhibit A to the districts from which they were transferred. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/6/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (A copy of this Order was emailed to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 9/6/2018) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER VACATING DIRECT FILING PROVISION AND REQUESTING CESSATION OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFERS : Pursuant to the scheduling order issued on 4/23/18 Doc No. 3573 , the provisions in Section III of the 2/15/13 and 3/14/16 Case Mgmt Orders Doc. Nos. 242 and 3096 allowing direct filing in this Court are VACATED effective 9/1/18, and no direct filings will be allowed after that date. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/24/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: The parties shall have to and including 8/31/18 to file any objections they may have to: (1) adding 3:13-CV-283, 3:13-CV-1017, 3:14-CV-1264, and 3:14-CV-1271 to the list of cases to be included in Remand Group 1, and (2) transferring all direct-filings to the jurisdictions identified in the proposed list and issuing a suggestion of remand in the cases listed above . Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/16/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER The Defendants' ( 3623 in 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG) Consent MOTION to reset Status Conference is GRANTED. The Status Conference is RESET 9/19/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/26/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 27 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 7/18/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty A. Davis, N. Ward. Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. LaDue, J. Winter. Topics discussed included status of Group 5 and 6 discovery, the proposed pretrial order on remand, upcoming expert video depositions, pro se cases and pending motions. Following discussion, the court directed plaintiff's counsel to file any motion to enforce settlement in Simpson v. Biomet, 3:16cv466, by Aug 9, 2018. Next status conference set for Aug 27, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT) before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Remote Attendance Order for July 18, 2018 Status Conference Call in information for the hearing on 7/18/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/12/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 25 Docket Annotation: The Dismissal Order entered on 5/29/2018 related to only three member cases, but was inadvertently docketed in all pending member cases. To avoid confusion and correct the error, the original entry [Doc. No. 3593 ] was deleted from the master and all member case dockets, and the order was redocketed in 3:12md2391 [Doc. No. 3596 ] and the related member cases (3:13cv1243, 3:14cv1243, and 3:16cv170).Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 24 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/17/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer. Dft appeared by atty John Winter and John LaDue. The Court hears from parties. A Status Conference is set for 7/18/2018 at 1:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter J. Hoffman.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the May 17, 2018 status conference.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/9/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER - This order activates Group 6 (Exh. A) for case specific discovery purposes and establishes deadlines for winding up the MDL proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/23/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
April 16, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint by Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction LLC.(Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
April 11, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Annette Williams. Biomet Orthopedics LLC served on 3/19/2018, answer due 4/9/2018. (Summerill PHV, Peter) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
April 11, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Annette Williams. (Summerill PHV, Peter) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
April 11, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Annette Williams. (Summerill PHV, Peter) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING 3560 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Parties given to and including April 11, 2018 to file the joint proposed scheduling order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/10/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
April 5, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by John D LaDue on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics Inc, Biomet US Reconstruction (LaDue, John) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
April 5, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Linder Hanig on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics Inc, Biomet US Reconstruction (Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
April 3, 2018 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Annette Williams.(Summerill PHV, Peter) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER By agreement of the parties, the court established deadlines and a schedule for briefing summary judgment motions in the cases identified in Exhibits A, B, and C to this order. See order for details.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/29/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The Court AFFORDS the plaintiffs 14 days from the date of this order within which to file an amended complaint properly alleging jurisdiction and venue. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/29/18. (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Peter W Summerill PHV for Annette Williams. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/28/2018. (mtr) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
March 26, 2018 Filing 10 Application for Attorney Peter W. Summerill to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Annette Williams. (MDL-PHV Temporary Login, ) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING IN PART Plaintiffs Steering Committee's request to take video depositions of its generic expert witnesses, and DIRECTING parties to submit proposed agreed scheduling order by April 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/26/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
March 26, 2018 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Utah; Case Number 1:18-cv-00028. Original file and docket sheet received. [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
March 26, 2018 Filing 7 CLERKS ORDER of Conditional Transfer re Biomet M2a Magnum Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation MDL 2391 signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel (rks) [Transferred from Utah on 3/26/2018.] [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
March 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related MDL Case by Annette Williams (Summerill, Peter) [Transferred from Utah on 3/26/2018.] [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
March 2, 2018 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Biomet Manufacturing Corp. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl) [Transferred from Utah on 3/26/2018.] [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
March 2, 2018 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Biomet. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl) [Transferred from Utah on 3/26/2018.] [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
March 2, 2018 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Biomet Orthpedics Inc. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl) [Transferred from Utah on 3/26/2018.] [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
March 2, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-2951895) filed by Annette Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells (Summerill, Peter) [Transferred from Utah on 3/26/2018.] [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]
March 2, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells. Plaintiff Annette Williams is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh) [Transferred from Utah on 3/26/2018.] [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 1/26/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Biomet Orthopedics Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Orthpedics Inc doing business as Biomet Orthopedics LLC
Represented By: Rick L. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet US Reconstruction
Represented By: Mary E. Hershewe
Represented By: Rick L. Rose
Represented By: Heather Carson Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Orthopedics LLC
Represented By: Mary E. Hershewe
Represented By: Rick L. Rose
Represented By: Heather Carson Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Manufacturing Corp
Represented By: Mary E. Hershewe
Represented By: Rick L. Rose
Represented By: Heather Carson Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Inc
Represented By: Mary E. Hershewe
Represented By: Rick L. Rose
Represented By: Heather Carson Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Williams
Represented By: Peter W. Summerill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?