Turcios Rodriguez v. Wright et al
Plaintiff: Fredy Samuel Turcios Rodriguez
Defendant: Colby Vanderbeek, Eddie Wright and Tabatha Zamora
Not Classified By Court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 1:2021cv00046
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 2nd MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Fredy Samuel Turcios Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Fredy Samuel Turcios Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Envelope)(kpf)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Partial Filing fee: $ 60.57 received, receipt number 4681094137 (mh)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT TO COLLECTION OF FEES from Inmate Trust Account filed by Fredy Samuel Turcios Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT TO COLLECTION OF FEES from Inmate Trust Account filed by Fredy Samuel Turcios Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Colby Vanderbeek, Eddie Wright, Tabatha Zamora (Originally received by the court on 04/01/2021). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Fredy Samuel Turcios Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Envelope 1) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (mh)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: $60.57. If initial partial fee is not paid within 30 days, the case will be dismissed. Collection of Fees Sent: Yes Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 04/07/2021. (mh)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Originally received by the court on 04/01/2021) filed by Plaintiff Fredy Samuel Turcios Rodriguez. (mh)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Fredy Samuel Turcios Rodriguez received from Correctional Institution (mh)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 04/01/2021) filed by Plaintiff Fredy Samuel Turcios Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Nonincarcerated Party Motion)(mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turcios Rodriguez v. Wright et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colby Vanderbeek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tabatha Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredy Samuel Turcios Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?